Craig Hospital et al v. UMR, Inc.
Plaintiff: Craig Hospital and CNS Medical Group, PC
Defendant: UMR, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00494
Filed: March 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Insurance Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay their own costs and attorney fees, by Judge John L. Kane on 06/01/2010. (wjc, )
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 45 Joint Motion to Amend 13 Scheduling Order. Dispositive Motions due by 4/9/2010. Discovery due by 4/30/2010, by Judge John L. Kane on 02/01/2010.(wjc, )
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Minute ORDER striking 43 Joint Motion to Amend Minute Order. It is to be refiled as a Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, by Judge John L. Kane on 1/27/10.(jak, )
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER granting 41 Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling and Discovery Order. Discovery due by 1/15/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 2/26/2010, by Judge John L. Kane on 12/15/2009.(wjc, )
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER granting 32 Plaintiff's Third Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order to Extend the Expert Disclosure Deadlines, by Judge John L. Kane on 11/13/2009.(wjc, )
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER granting 28 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order to Extend the Expert Disclosure Deadlines, by Judge John L. Kane on 09/24/09.(wjc, )
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 11/16/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/23/09. (kmtcd)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Plaintiffs 19 Motion to Amend Complaint is GRANTED. The Amended Complaint is accepted as filed. UMRs 21 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is DENIED. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b), Unite d States Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: Convene such settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case, by Judge John L. Kane on 09/15/09.(wjc, )
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to allow the parties up to and including two weeks from the date Plaintiffs receive Defendant UMR's responses to Plaintiffs' 07/02/2009 discovery requests to amend pleadings and join parties, by Judge John L. Kane on 07/31/09.(wjc, )
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge John L. Kane on 06/16/09. (wjc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craig Hospital et al v. UMR, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Hospital
Represented By: R. Craig Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CNS Medical Group, PC
Represented By: R. Craig Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMR, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?