Baker et al v. USA
Plaintiff: Theresa Baker and Christopher Baker
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2009cv00518
Filed: March 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Minute ORDER granting 24 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Minute Order Entered October 13, 2009 (Doc. 21) by Defendant USA. The courts October 13, 2009 Minute Order (# 21 ) shall be amended as follows: the court shall not require that the settlement agreement be confidential by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/28/09.(kmtcd) Modified on 10/30/2009 create linkage (wjc, ).
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED 19 ORDER: The 17 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. The Department of Defense and the United States Army are dismissed as parties to this action. The caption shall be amended as reflected above, by Judge John L. Kane on 10/02/09. (wjc, )
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 10/13/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/21/09. (kmtcd)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING: Scheduling Conference set for 9/21/2009 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/11/09. (kmtcd)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING: Scheduling Conference set for 9/21/2009 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/10/09. (kmtcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Baker
Represented By: Justin R. Melat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Baker
Represented By: Justin R. Melat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?