MacLuckie v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Kim M. MacLuckie
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested Party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2009cv00595
Filed: March 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Application for an Award of Attorney's Fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412 [Docket No. 26] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as indicated in this order. ORDERED defendant is ord ered to pay the amount of $1235.47 to plaintiff for attorney's fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d). ORDERED that Plaintiff's Uncontested Motion to Set Status Conference [Docket No. 31] and plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Refer Pending Motions to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation [Docket No. 32] are DENIED as moot by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/03/14.(jhawk, )
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 Unopposed Motion for Attorney's Fees Under 42 U.S.C. § 406 b) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. p. 60(b)(6). Plaintiff's counsel is awarded attorney's fees in the amount of $12,185.75. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/18/12.(mnfsl, )
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Remanding to Agency. Case is remanded to the Commissioner for additional proceedings in accordance with thie Order, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/6/11. (gmssl, )
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying 13 Defendant's Motion for Voluntary Remand. Briefing to commence with schedule set forth in minute order dated 7/22/09, by Judge John L. Kane on 7/23/09.(gmssl, )
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases (ORDER) SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 7/27/2009. SS Defendants Brief due by 8/26/2009. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 9/10/2009, by Judge John L. Kane on 6/15/09. (gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacLuckie v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim M. MacLuckie
Represented By: Ann J. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?