Alcohol Monitoring Systems, Inc. v. CB Home Detention Equipment and Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alcohol Monitoring Systems, Inc.
Defendant: CB Home Detention Equipment and Services, Inc., Christina Miller and Walter Frederick
Case Number: 1:2009cv00605
Filed: March 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Patent Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Motion Hearing held on 7/7/2009. Denying as Moot 19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Granting 33 Motion to Dismiss. Judgment shall enter in favor of the defendants and against the plaintiff. Defendants may have their costs. (Court Reporter Janet Coppock) (pabcd)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/14/2009 03:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/8/09. (ebs, )
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Setting Hearing Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16: In Court Hearing set for 5/14/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/21/09. (ebs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alcohol Monitoring Systems, Inc. v. CB Home Detention Equipment and Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alcohol Monitoring Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Phillip S. Lorenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CB Home Detention Equipment and Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?