Sheriff v. Regional Transportation District
Plaintiff: Michael S. Sheriff
Defendant: Regional Transportation District
Case Number: 1:2009cv00651
Filed: March 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. The parties filed a Stipulation for Dismissal 20 . This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay his or its own costs and attorneys' fees. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 09/28/2009. (sah, )
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend its Answer. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the Second Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint found at docket #15-2. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/1/2009. (mehcd)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/18/2009. (mehcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheriff v. Regional Transportation District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Sheriff
Represented By: Scott Frederick Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Transportation District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?