Hagerman v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Plaintiff: Penny M. Hagerman
Defendant: Eli Lilly and Company, Valeant Pharmaceuticals International, Amarin Corporation, plc., Amarin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Athena Neurosciences, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00672
Filed: March 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Zita L. Weinshienk
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice 76 filed 06/01/2010, is APPROVED. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 10/08/2010, is VACATED. The jury trial set to commence 11/01/2010, is VACATED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/02/2010. (sah, )
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER. Dismissal documents are to be filed on or before 04/29/2010. Defendant Valeants Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint 16 filed June 24, 2009, is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/25/2010.(sah, )
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE ORDER granting 64 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File AmendedAnswer. The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept the attached Exhibit A - Defendant Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.s First Amended Answer to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint - for filing. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/13/2010.(sah, )
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER. The Motion for Enlargement 57 is GRANTED; the Motion to Stay 30(b)(6) Depositions 60 is DENIED. Discovery due by 5/17/2010., Dispositive Motions due by 5/17/2010., Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/20/2009.(sah, )
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/17/09. (bnbcd, )
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER. On or before 08/21/2009, the parties shall submit a deposition schedule specifying every deposition to be taken, the date of the deposition, its duration expressed in hours, and the time and place of the deposition. The Scheduling Order is modified to reflect that all depositions are limited in time to not more than seven hours, absent leave of court. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/14/2009. (sah, )
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Fifteen (15) day Jury Trial set for 7/12/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 6/25/2010 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/14/09. (rebsec, )
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion to Amend Complaint. On all further filings plaintiff ALLEN HAGERMAN is to be added to the caption by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/15/2009.(sah, )
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. A Scheduling/ Planning Conference is set for 7/14/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/22/2009. (sah, )
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing reassignment to another judge by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 04/01/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hagerman v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny M. Hagerman
Represented By: Richard Joshua Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valeant Pharmaceuticals International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amarin Corporation, plc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amarin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Athena Neurosciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?