U.S. Advisor, LLC et al v. Berkshire Property Advisors, LLC
Plaintiff: USA Enclave at Belleville Station, LLC, U.S. Advisor, LLC, USA Enclave at Belleview Station, DST, USA Enclave at Belleview Station SPE, LLC and USA Enclave at Belleview Station Leaseco, LLC
Defendant: Berkshire Property Advisors, LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv00697
Filed: March 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Real Property: Other Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity - Real Property

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT This case is remanded to the District Court, Denver County, Colorado, where it was originally filed. Because this Court lacks jurisdiction over this matter, all active orders, including the Preliminary Injunction Scheduling Order 14 are hereby vacated, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/10/09. (ebs, )
June 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying as moot 22 Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaim, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/21/09.(ebs, )
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 6/1/2009. Denying without prejudice with leave to file a new unopposed Motion to Seal 33 Berkshire Property Advisors, LLC's Motion t o Seal Pursuant to D.C.Colo.LCivR. 7.2. Denying without prejudice with leave to file a new unopposed Motion to Seal 39 Berkshire Property Advisors, LLC's Motion to Seal Pursuant to D.C.Colo.LCivR. 7.2. Clerk shall temporarily seal docs. 25, 26, 28, 29, 36, and 37, pending a new Motion to Seal. Granting 45 Berkshire Property Advisors, LLC's Motion to Amend Pursuant to Rule 15. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe.) (ebs, )
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 9 Motion for Order Approving Stipulation, 5 Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion for Discovery, and 6 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/8/09.(ebs, )
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/4/09. (ebs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Advisor, LLC et al v. Berkshire Property Advisors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA Enclave at Belleville Station, LLC
Represented By: Scott R. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Advisor, LLC
Represented By: Eric B. Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA Enclave at Belleview Station, DST
Represented By: Eric B. Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA Enclave at Belleview Station SPE, LLC
Represented By: Eric B. Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA Enclave at Belleview Station Leaseco, LLC
Represented By: Eric B. Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Property Advisors, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Ray Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?