Viesti Associates, Inc. v. Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company et al
Plaintiff: Viesti Associates, Inc.
Defendant: Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company and R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company
Case Number: 1:2009cv00743
Filed: April 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Copyright Office
County: La Plata
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Presiding Judge: Laird T. Milburn
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:501 Copyright Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. These consolidated cases are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, the parties to bear their own costs and attorney fees, by Judge John L. Kane on 12/22/2009. (wjc, )
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying as moot 47 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Scheduling and Discovery Order; denying as moot 52 Defendants' Motion to Compel by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 12/09/2009.(wjc, )
November 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 60 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint (Case Number 09-cv-00743-JLK-LTM). Defendants shall file their Response to the Third Amended Complaint no later than thirty days from today's date, by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 11/11/2009.(wjc, )
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 58 Parties' Joint Motion to Amending the 44 Scheduling and Discovery Order, by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 11/09/2009.(wjc, ) Modified on 11/13/2009 to correct filed date and spelling, and create linkage (wjc, ).
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 AMENDED STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 10/21/2009. (wjc, )
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 35 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Plaintiffs to file Second Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 09/30/2009.(wjc, )
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 25 Joint Motion for Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 9/1/09.(gms, )
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Stipulation and PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 08/31/09. (wjc, )
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION: Defendants 18 Unopposed Motion to Consolidate (09-cv-00743-JLK-LTM) is GRANTED. Case No. 09-cv-01093-JLK-LTM is consolidated with 09-cv-00743-JLK-LTM as indicated in the caption, by Judge John L. Kane on 08/12/09.(wjc, )
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/3/2009 at 10:00 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn, by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 07/02/09. (wjc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viesti Associates, Inc. v. Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viesti Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Craig F. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?