Loftice v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Charles Frank Loftice
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00748
Filed: April 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REGARDING RETURN OF TRIAL EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS. Counsel shall contact the Court's courtroom deputy to make arrangements for the return of all trial exhibits and depositions, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/21/2010. (rpmcd)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND ORDER FOR JUDGMENT. Judgment shall enter for the defendant, dismissing this action and awarding statutory costs, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/20/2010. (rpmcd )
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Setting Court Trial for 8/2/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A and proposed pretrial order due by 4:00 p.m. 6/4/2010, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/16/2010. (rpmcd) Modified on 4/16/2010 to note this is a trial to Court not Jury (jjh, ).
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER For Calendar Call set 4/16/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A with counsel to provide a joint statement when the case is called, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/28/2010. (rpmcd)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER to Comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 as to any information to be submitted under seal based on the 18 Protective Order, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/22/2009. (rpmcd)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Calendar Call on 10/2/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Richard P. Matsch by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 07/23/09. (jjh, )
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/15/2009 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on July 9, 2009. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/14/2009. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loftice v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Frank Loftice
Represented By: Bryan E. Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?