Weinstein v. Fiserv, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eric D. Weinstein
Defendant: Fiserv, Inc., Fiserv Trust Company, NTC & Co., Trust Industrial Bank, Robert Beriault Holdings, Inc., Lincoln Trust Company, TD Ameritrade Online Holdings Corp. and TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation
Case Number: 1:2009cv00752
Filed: April 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fraud

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting 78 Defendants Motion to Dismiss All Claims As to All Defendants; granting 79 Defendants Motion to Dismiss All Claims Based on SLUSA (Securities Litigation Uniform Standards Act of 1998); granting 80 Defendants Motion to Dismiss Defendant Fiserv, Inc.; finding as moot 111 Defendants Motion for Reconsideration of Order Regarding Election of Arbitration Rights by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/29/2011.(erv, )
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER re: 86 Stipulation of Dismissal of Party,filed by Trust Industrial Bank, TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation, Robert Beriault, Fiserv, Inc., Retirement Accounts, Inc., TD Ameritrade Online Holding Corp., Lincoln Trust Company, NTC & Co., Fiserv Trust Company, Robert Beriault Holdings, Inc., TD Ameritrade Trust Company, NTC & Co. LLP, TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation; TD Ameritrade Online Holding Corp.; Robert Beriault and Robert Beriault Holdings, Inc. are withdrawn, and all claims against the Dismissed Defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs and the Dismissed Defendants shall bear their own attorneys fees and costs as to the claims hereby dismissed. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/4/2010. (erv, )
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Status Conference held on 12/15/2009. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, doc # 11 is WITHDRAWN by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER granting 61 Motion to Modify Deadlines. Plaintiffs shall file and serve the Consolidated Complaint on or before 11/06/2009; Defendants may file and serve a Motion to Dismiss on or before 12/14/2009; Plaintiffs Response to Motion to Dismiss is due on or before 01/13/2010; and Defendants Reply to Plaintiffs Response is due on or before 02/12/2010, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/29/2009.(wjc, )
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER. The Weinstein/Rutman Plaintiffs Motion 13 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART and the Cohen Plaintiffs Motion 21 is DENIED. Lovell Stewart Halebian LLP are appointed Interim Lead Counsel. Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh & Jardine PC are ap pointed Interim Liaison Counsel. The Complaint in Rutman 1 , together with the Amended Complaint 4 and currently pending Motion to Dismiss 11 in Weinstein, are deemed withdrawn. Plaintiffs shall file within thirty (30) days from the date of th is Order a Complaint in the consolidated cases entitled Consolidated Complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including thirty (30) days after Plaintiffs Consolidated Complaint is filed within which to file a Motion to Dismiss under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 09/30/2009.(sah, )
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re: the parties 56 Notice of Withdrawal of Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Related Cases. Upon review of the Notice, the Court reads it as a motion of withdrawal, and hereby GRANTS the motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Unopposed Motion To Consolidate Related Cases 41 is deemed withdrawn. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/18/09. (erv, )
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES. The folowing actions are consolidated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a), and future filings in any of these actions shall contain the caption as set forth above and shall be docketed under the above-referenced No. 09-cv-00752-CMA-CBS: 1) 09-cv-01222-CMA-CBS and 2) 09-cv-01356-CMA-CBS IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Motions to Appoint Interim Lead Counsel 13 and 21 are TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 06/30/2009.(sah, )
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/14/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/4/09. (erv, ) (Modified on 5/5/2009 corrected filing date to 5/4/09)(erv, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weinstein v. Fiserv, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric D. Weinstein
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiserv, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiserv Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NTC & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust Industrial Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Beriault Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Ameritrade Online Holdings Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?