Granite Southlands Town Center, LLC v. Alberta Town Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Granite Southlands Town Center, LLC
Defendant: Alberta Town Center, LLC and Land Title Guarantee Company
Case Number: 1:2009cv00799
Filed: April 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Presiding Judge: Zita L. Weinshienk
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER ADOPTING 258 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: 210 Motion for Attorney Fees. By Judge Sterling Johnson, Jr on 3/13/13.(mnfsl, )
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER adopting 260 Report and Recommendation, re: 199 Motion for Attorney Fees. By Judge Sterling Johnson, Jr on 2/7/13.(mnfsl, )
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Sterling Johnson, Jr: Status Conference held on 12/17/2012. The court reserves ruling on 210 attorney fees and 259 motion to amend. Status Conference set for 1/25/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Sterling Johnson Jr. Court Reporter: Anthony Frisolone. (mnfsl, )
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Supplemental Motion 223 is GRANTED to the extent that the Court will consider the corrections stated in the Supplemental Motion in its adjudication of the pending motion for fees 199 . Defendant Alberta Town Center LLCs Motion for Discovery 229 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/9/2011.(sah, )
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 206 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AGAINST DEFENDANT ALBERTA. (Modifies and Replaces the Court's Previous Order ECF 203 Temporary Restraining Order. Temporary Restraining Order is effective upon the filing of a bond or cash in lieu of bond. In Court Hearing set for 9/29/2012 at 03:00 PM before Judge Sterling Johnson Jr, by Judge Sterling Johnson, Jr on 9/23/11. (gmssl, )
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 203 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AGAINST DEFENDANT ALBERTA. Upon the filing of such Bond or Cash in Lieu of Bond by Plaintiff, the Clerk of this Court shall issue citation and notice to Defendant of the Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction Hearing, said hearing being set by the Court for 9/28/2011, at 1:00pm EST. By Judge Sterling Johnson, Jr on 9/22/2011. (sah, )
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ADDENDUM re: 195 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. By Judge Sterling Johnson, Jr on 9/13/2011. (sah, )
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Based on the foregoing, the Court finds in favor of Granite on its breach of contract claim. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff Granite Southlands Center, LLC and against Defendant Alberta Town Center, LLC. This ruling makes it unnecessary to discuss any other issues raised by the parties. By Judge Sterling Johnson, Jr on 9/2/2011. (sah, )
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER. Defendant Alberta Town Center, LLC's Unopposed Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 to Dismiss without Prejudice Its Counterclaims against Plaintiff 174 is GRANTED. By Judge Sterling Johnson, Jr on 2/14/2011.(sah, )
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER. The Stipulated Motion for Leave to Interplead Funds 152 is granted. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 12/07/2010.(sah, )
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER. The trial-setting Order of 07/26/2010 127 is VACATED. This case is re-set for a trial to jury for five days commencing at 10:30 a.m. on 02/14/2011, in Courtroom A801. Counsel shall review the pre-trial order and shall file a short status report with the Court on or before 1/10/2011. A trial preparation conference before Senior Judge Zita Leeson Weinshienk is hereby set on 01/18/2011, at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom A801. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 10/20/2010. (sah, )
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 143 AMENDED ORDER re: 138 Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). This Amended Order amends the Court's Order of 09/01/2010 only by correcting a typographical error by deleting footnote 24 appearing therein. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 09/22/2010. (sah, )
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER. Alberta Defendants Expedited Motion For Equitable Relief ToPrevent Vexatious And Repetitive Litigation Pursuant To The All-Writs Act, 28 U.S.C. § 1651(a) And Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 54(b) 131 is denied in part and granted in pa rt. The motion is denied as to the Alberta Defendants request for equitable relief. The motion is granted as to the Alberta Defendants request for entry of Judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b) in favor of Defendants Donald G. Provost, Allan G. Provost, and Peter M. Cudlip, and a separate Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b) judgment shall be entered. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 09/01/2010.(sah, )
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER. This case is set for a trial to jury for five days commencing at 10:30 a.m. on 01/17/2011, in Courtroom A801. Counsel shall review the pre-trial order and shall file a short status report with the Court on or before 12/03/2010. All motions i n limine shall be filed on or before 11/19/2010. A trial preparation conference before Senior Judge Zita Leeson Weinshienk is hereby set on 12/14/2010, at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom A801, at which time any pending motions, including motions in limine, will be heard. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 07/26/2010. (sah, )
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Minute ORDER granting 122 Plaintiff Granite Southlands Town Center LLCs Unopposed Motion for Paul Trahan to Appear by Telephone at the Pretrial Conference, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/9/10.(lyg, )
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER. The Court accepts and adopts the Recommendation 119 in its entirety.Plaintiffs Amended Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint (Motion To Amend) 115 is denied. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 06/28/2010.(sah, )
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 111 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/19/2010.(klmcd)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion For Leave To Substitute Exhibit 1 To MotionFor Reconsideration 109 is granted. Plaintiffs Motion For Reconsideration And For Leave To Amend Complaint 87 is denied. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 02/17/2010.(sah, )
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER. Defendant Alberta Town Center LLCs Motion For Partial Summary Judgment 75 is denied. The hearing previously set for Wednesday, 02/17/2010 is vacated. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 02/09/2010.(sah, )
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion To Withdraw Document No. 102 104 is granted, and Doc. No. 102 hereby is stricken. Doc. No. 102 in this case hereby is sealed by the Court. Plaintiffs Motion For Leave To File Surreply 103 is granted. Plaintiff shall file its Surreply (Doc. No. 103-2) as a separate document on or before 02/02/2010. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 02/01/2010.(sah, )
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE ORDER granting 94 Unopposed Motion to be Excused from Attending Settlement Conference. Counsel for Land Title shall be available to receive a telephone call from the Court at any time during the scheduled Settlement Conference. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/20/2010.(sah, )
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER. Defendants Peter M. Cudlip, Donald G. Provost And Allan G. Provosts Motion To Dismiss Pursuant To F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) (Motion To Dismiss) 60 is granted. Tclaims for Fraudulent Inducement As To The Release and Actual And Exemplary Damages For Fraud contained in Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint are dismissed with prejudice. The Amended Complaint and cause of action aredismissed with prejudice against Defendants Peter M. Cudlip, Donald G. Provost And Allan G. Provost, and the case captio n shall be amended accordingly. This action shall proceed on the remaining claims against the remaining Defendants for Declaratory Judgment Regarding Escrow and Attorneys Fees And Costs Under the Escrow Agreement. The hearing previously set for 01/06/2010 is vacated. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 12/29/2009.(sah, )
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/21/2009. (klmcd)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 32 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and Join Additional Parties. Plaintiff shall file Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, attached as Exhibit A to Plaintiff's motion, as a separate document on or before 9/29/09, by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 9/16/09.(ebs, )
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER 29 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is stricken, by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 9/8/09. (gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Granite Southlands Town Center, LLC v. Alberta Town Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granite Southlands Town Center, LLC
Represented By: Osborne J. Dykes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberta Town Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land Title Guarantee Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?