Von Halley v. Milyard et al
Petitioner: Billy Von Halley
Respondent: Kevin Milyard and Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Case Number: 1:2009cv00812
Filed: April 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Minute ORDER denying 29 Motion for Void Judgment on Appealibility by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 01/03/11.(jjh, )
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 19 Notice of Appeal by Billy Von Halley, by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 01/05/10. Appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a proper 1915 motion with district court.(bjrsl, )
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER of Dismissal. Ordered that the habeas corpus application, and amended application, and the second amended application are denied and the action is dismissed as barred by the one-year limitation period by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 11/19/09. (jjh, )
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response. Ordered that within 20 days Respondents shall file a Pre-Answer Response. Ordered that within 20 days of the filing of the Pre-Answer Response Applicant may file a Reply by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/10/09. (jjh, )
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Applicant to File Second Amended Application within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/08/09. (jjh, )
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Applicant to File Amended Application within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/05/09. (jjh, )
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing applicant to Cure Deficiency. Applicant Shall have 30 days to either submit a 1915 motion or pay the filing fee, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/7/09. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Von Halley v. Milyard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Billy Von Halley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin Milyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?