Hanratty v. Zynex, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Hanratty
Defendant: Zynex, Inc., Thomas Sandgaard and Fritz Allison
Case Number: 1:2009cv00816
Filed: April 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Securities/Commodities Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:78 Securities Exchange Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER. Under FED.R.CIV.P. 42(a)(2) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil Action No. 09-cv-00816-MSK-MJW and Civil Action No. 09-cv-00829-REB-KMT are CONSOLIDATED with Civil Action No. 09-cv-00780-REB-KLM for all purposes. Under D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil Ac tion No. 09-cv-00816-MSK-MJW and Civil Action No. 09-cv-00829-REB-KMT ARE REASSIGNED to United States Magistrate Judge Kristin L. Mix. John Trommald, Heather Trommald, and Howard Makler are APPOINTED as co-lead plaintiffs for the putative plaintiff class in these consolidated actions. The Shuman Law Firm and Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP are APPROVED as co-lead counsel. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/03/2010. (sah, )
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 14 Joint Motion to Vacate Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference currently set for 06/24/09 at 8:30 AM and the related deadlines are vacated. Defendants are granted an extension of time to 45 days after the filing and service of a consolidated complaint to answer or otherwise respond, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 05/18/09.(wjc, )
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/24/2009 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 04/30/09. (wjc, )
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depo sitions from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/22/09. (mskcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanratty v. Zynex, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hanratty
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zynex, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Sandgaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fritz Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?