March 26, 2012 |
Filing
288
MINUTE ENTRY for Bench Trial Day One held before Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/26/2012. Opening statements. Witness testimony and exhibits received/refused are as set forth in the Minutes. 285 Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED,requiring the posting of either a bond or the sum of $25,000 to be paid into the registry of the Court by close of business tomorrow, March 27, 2012, 5:00 p.m. Trial continues. (Court Reporter: Paul Zuckerman) (mskcd)
|
November 30, 2011 |
Filing
281
MINUTE ENTRY for Final Pretrial Conference held before Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/30/2011. 243 Motion in Limine is DENIED with leave to renew at trial. The Final Pretrial Order 252 is ADOPTED. Two week Bench Trial is set for 3/19/2012 01:30 P M and will continue through the week of March 26, 2012 as necessary, in Courtroom A901, 901 19th Street Denver, CO. Trial will also begin at 1:30 p.m.on March 26, 2012. All subsequent days of trial will begin at 8:30 a.m., unless the parties are advised otherwise. This trial is set junior to a criminal trial in Case No. 10-cr-00502. Other matters addressed are as set forth in the Minutes. (Court Reporter: Paul Zuckerman) (mskcd)
|
October 17, 2011 |
Filing
278
ORDER SETTING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2011 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/17/11. (msksec, )
|
March 30, 2011 |
Filing
208
Minute Entry for Evidentiary Hearing on Joint 702 Motion held before Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/30/2011. The hearing is continued with regard to witness Throupe's testimony as reflected in the Minutes, but will not be reset at this time. The Court's reference of defendant's Motion to Strike to Magistrate Judge Hegarty is WITHDRAWN and 202 the Motion to Strike is DENIED. The hearing set for tomorrow, March 31, at 8:30 a.m., will proceed as scheduled with regard to witness Gary Kopff. Hearing continued (Throupe).(Court Reporter: Paul Zuckerman) (mskcd)
|
February 22, 2011 |
Filing
200
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT: The Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 154 is GRANTED. At the conclusion of the proceedings in this case, the Court will enter judgment in favor of the Defend ants on the Plaintiffs claim for tortious interference with prospective business advantage. The Clerk of the Court shall terminate the motions at docket #184 and 185 as having been granted by the Courts August 4, 2010 Order (# 191) setting an evident iary hearing on those motions. The Court having resolved all dispositive motions, the parties shall be prepared at the close of the hearing on March 31, 2011 to schedule a date for the Final Pretrial Conference and the setting of trial. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/22/11.(msksec, )
|
August 19, 2010 |
Filing
196
ORDER denying 153 Plaintiff's Motion for Order Compelling Discovery of Claimed Privileged Informatino based upon the Crim/Fraud Exception, and denying as moot 177 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Motion for Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/19/2010. (mehcd)
|
August 12, 2010 |
Filing
193
Opinion and ORDER Granting, in Part, Motions to Dismiss. Granting in part 46 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and granting in part 67 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss insofar as the Plaintiffs claims for fraud, breach of f iduciary duty, tortious interference with contract, abuse of process, violation of the Colorado Consumer Protection Act, negligent supervision, and violation of the Colorado Organized Crime Control Act are dismissed for failure to state a claim, and denied in part, insofar as the Plaintiff has adequately pled claims against both Defendants for tortious interference with prospective business advantage and breach of contract /breach of the covenant of good faith and fair dealing, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/12/10.(gmssl, )
|
August 4, 2010 |
Filing
190
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 161 Plaintiff's Second Motion for an Order Compelling Discovery. Defendants shall inform Plaintiff of the manner in which they will choose to proceed by 8/9/2010. Any request for attorney's fees in this matter is denied. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/4/2010. (mehcd)
|
July 20, 2010 |
Filing
180
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 146 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Payment of Expert Fees Incurred to Respond to Subpoena, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/20/2010. (mehcd)
|
July 2, 2010 |
Filing
169
Courtroom Minutes/Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motions Hearing held on 7/2/2010, denying 150 Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Strike the Number of Defendants' Expert Witnesses that Exceed the Limitation Allowed in the Scheduling Order. As to 153 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Compel Discovery of Claimed Privileged Information Based Upon the Crime/Fraud Exception, Defendants' response is due by 7/12/2010; Plaintiff's reply is due by 7/27/2010. As to 161 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel Discovery, briefs shall be filed in accordance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Court Reporter FTR - C. Coomes) (mehcd)
|
May 20, 2010 |
Filing
131
MINUTE ORDER withdrawing 128 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order, in light of the Notice of Withdrawal filed by Plaintiff on 5/19/2010. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/20/2010. (mehcd)
|
April 1, 2010 |
Filing
115
ORDER granting 96 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Jury Demand, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/1/2010. (mehcd)
|
March 25, 2010 |
Filing
113
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 69 Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Compelling Discovery. Defendants shall respond to the requests so ordered no later than 04/09/2010. All requests for attorney's fees in this matter are denied, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/25/2010.(wjc, )
|
March 16, 2010 |
Filing
105
MINUTE ORDER granting 94 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Surreply. The Court will consider the surreply in adjudicating the motion to compel. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/16/2010. (mehcd) Modified on 3/18/2010 to add text word consider (wjc, ).
|
February 22, 2010 |
Filing
101
MINUTE ORDER denying 98 Second Stipulated Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order for failure to establish good cause to amend deadlines that have been set in accordance with Judge Krieger's 24 Trial Preparation Order-Civil, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 02/22/2010.(wjc, )
|
December 8, 2009 |
Filing
64
MINUTE ORDER granting 53 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, found at docket #53-2. Defendants shall respond to the First Amended Complaint in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a). By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/8/2009. (mehcd)
|
November 30, 2009 |
Filing
60
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 58 Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/30/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2010, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/30/2009.(wjc, )
|
September 24, 2009 |
Filing
45
AMENDED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 09/24/2009. (wjc, )
|
September 16, 2009 |
Filing
40
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 38 the Joint Motion for Entry of Proposed Confidentiality Order. The proposed Confidentiality Order is refused. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/16/2009. (mehcd)
|
August 10, 2009 |
Filing
34
MINUTE ORDER granting 28 Defendants' Motion to Amend Answer to Assert Additional Affirmative Defenses. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the Amended Answer to Complaint found at docket #28-2. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/10/2009. (mehcd)
|
June 23, 2009 |
Filing
24
TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/5/2010 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/23/09. (msksec, )
|
April 23, 2009 |
Filing
15
ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/23/09. (mskcd)
|
April 16, 2009 |
Filing
7
ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 04/16/2009. (sah, )
|