Dodson v. Cables et al
Plaintiff: Joyce A. Dodson
Defendant: Jacqueline H. Cables and USA
Case Number: 1:2009cv00866
Filed: April 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
County: Mesa
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Presiding Judge: Laird T. Milburn
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:1346 Tort Claim

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The 37 Stipulation for Dismissal is APPROVED; the Status Conference scheduled for 11/30/2009 is VACATED; and this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorneys fees and costs, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/16/2009. (wjc, )
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: The 2 Order of Reference issued by Judge Richard P. Matsch is hereby vacated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), United States Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn is designated to convene such settlement conferences and direct related proceedings as may facilitate resolution of this case. Status Conference is hereby set in this matter for 09/15/2009 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 09/04/09. (wjc, )
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Attendance by Telephone by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 08/20/09.(jjh, )
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/24/2009 11:00 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn, by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 6/25/09. (gms, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodson v. Cables et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce A. Dodson
Represented By: John Keith Killian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline H. Cables
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?