SAFECO Insurance Company of America v. Rees et al
Plaintiff: SAFECO Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Janice Rees, Brent Justin Gale and Zachery Keegan Snyder
Case Number: 1:2009cv00883
Filed: April 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Insurance Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause and Dismissing Complaint. Ordered that the Complaint against Brent Justin Gale is dismissed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/05/10. (jjh, )
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER for Dismissal of Defendants Janice Rees and Zachary Keegan Snyder. ORDERED that the complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to defendants Janice Rees and Zachary Keegan Snyder, each party to bear their attorneys fees and costs by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 09/29/10. (jjh, )
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER for counsel to file a Status Report by 8/13/2010, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/3/2010. (rpmcd )
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Determining the Duty to Defend and for Stay of this Civil Action. Safeco Insurance Company of America shall provide a defense to Janice Rees and Brent Justin Gale in Case Number 2009 CV 4124 in the District Court, Mesa County, Colorado. This civil action is stayed under further order of court. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/14/2009. (rpmcd)
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment attached thereto is accepted for filing by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 07/01/09.(jjh, )
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/14/2009 at 03:00 PM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on July 9, 2009. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/14/2009. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAFECO Insurance Company of America v. Rees et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAFECO Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Hilary Dawn Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Justin Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachery Keegan Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?