Bruno v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tiffany Bruno
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2009cv00896
Filed: April 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulated Motion For Dismissal With Prejudice 29 is GRANTED. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 06/25/2010 is VACATED. The jury trial set for 07/19/2010 is VACATED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 02/17/2010. (sah, )
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER a five (5) day Jury Trial set for 7/19/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 6/25/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/23/09. (rebsec, )
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. A Scheduling and Planning Conference is set for 7/23/2009 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 05/12/2009. (sah, )
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. A Scheduling and Planning Conference is set for 6/18/2009 08:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 05/08/2009. (sah, )
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. A Scheduling and Planning Conference is set for 7/15/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 05/04/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruno v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Bruno
Represented By: Thomas J. Herd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Craig William Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?