Grant v. Potter
Plaintiff: Christine Grant
Defendant: John E. Potter
Case Number: 1:2009cv00918
Filed: April 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Presiding Judge: Zita L. Weinshienk
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Amended ORDER of Dismissal: re: 28 Order. Defendants Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) 12 is granted. Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment 13 is denied as moot. The case and cause of action is dismissed without prejudice, the parties to pay their own costs, by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 10/21/09. (gms, )
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery;Discovery stayed pending decision by Judge Weinshienk on 12 and 13 or until further Order of Court, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 08/12/2009.(mjwcd )
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 8 Defendant's Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 06/04/2009. Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2009 is vacated and reset to 7/27/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. (mjwcd )
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/28/09. (gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Grant
Represented By: John F.X. McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?