Gibson v. Campbell et al
Plaintiff: Wellman F. Gibson
Defendant: Anna Marie Campbell, C. Holst, Shirley Steinbeck, Marshall Griffith, Steinbeck and Aasen
Case Number: 1:2009cv00983
Filed: April 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Crowley
Presiding Judge: Zita L. Weinshienk
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 458 MINUTE ORDER Denying as moot 456 Motion for Order; In light of the Request to the Court ECF No. 457 to disregard Plaintiffs previous filing made on September 8, 2014, Plaintiffs pro se Request to the Court to Halt Any Actions Pertaining Settlement of Any Kind ECF No. 456 is DENIED AS MOOT, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/15/2014.(evana, )
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER DISMISSING CASE on the parties Stipulation for Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay its own attorney fees and costs, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/2/2014. (evana, )
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 452 MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference held on 6/25/2014 before Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Denying as moot 448 Motion for Ruling. Dismissal Paper due by 8/29/2014. Court Reporter: Mary George. (rkeec)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 445 MINUTE ORDER In light of the settlement of this case and the fact that dismissal papers are due June 30, 2014, the four-day bench trial set to commence on Tuesday, May 27, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. and the Final Trial Preparation Conference set on Thursday, May 15, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. are VACATED. Also, Plaintiffs pro se Request for Injunction for the Status Quo to Be Maintained ECF No. 438 is DENIED AS MOOT, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/2/2014.(evana, )
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 440 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held on 2/6/2014 proceedings held before Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Granting 435 Motion to Withdraw. Denying 377 Defendants Motion to Dismiss All Remaining Claims on Mootness Grounds. Set/Reset Hearings: 4-Day Ben ch Trial set to commence on 5/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1002 before Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Trial Preparation Conference set for 5/15/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A1002 before Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Court Reporter: Gwen Daniel. (wydcd, rrk)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 432 MINUTE ORDER striking 430 Plaintiffs untitled one-page filing asking about the status of the case, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/28/2014.(evana, )
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 424 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's pro se filings of December 3, 2013 and January 6, 2014 (ECF Nos. 422 and 423) are STRICKEN. Since Plaintiff is currently represented by counsel, the Court will not consider motions or filings that Plaintiff files pro se by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/07/14.(jjhsl, )
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Request for Copies Court Order 373 is DENIED AS MOOT. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Request for Judgement 374 is DENIED AS MOOT. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Notice to the Court & Request of Medical File 384 is DENIED AS MOOT. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Request to the Court 389 is DENIED AS MOOT. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge as to that motion 393 is REJECTED AS MOOT by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/04/13.(jjhsl, )
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 415 MINUTE ORDER denying 401 Motion for Judgment by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/29/13.(jjhsl, )
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER : a response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss All Remaining Claims on Mootness Grounds shall be filed by Monday, November 4, 2013. A Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A1002 before Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. That Plaintiffs counsel shall file a notice with the Court by Monday, October 14, 2014, indicating which of Plaintiffs pro se motions are adopted by counsel and which are moot. by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/4/2013. (trlee, )
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 392 APPOINTMENT ORDER. The Clerk shall select, notify, and appoint counsel to represent the pro se Plaintiff in this civil matter. By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/10/13. (mnfsl, )
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER to Show Cause. ORDERED that the Final Trial Preparation Conference is RESET to Tuesday, June 18, 2013, at 11:00 a.m. The Colorado Department of Corrections shall ensure that Plaintiff is made available for this hearing by teleconference. The C lerk of Court shall mail a copy ofthis Order to Plaintiff both at his address of record as well as the following address: Wellman E. Gibson, Inmate No. 74384 Centennial Correctional FacilityP.O. Box 600 Canon City, CO 81215 by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 06/12/13. (jjhsl, )
March 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 372 MINUTE ORDER; Plaintiff's 367 Request to Obtain Copies of Case Law is DENIED, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/24/2013.(klmcd, )
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 355 MINUTE ORDER; Plaintiff's 353 Request to be told of trial since Settlement Conference cancelled is STRICKEN, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/14/2013.(klmcd, )
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 352 MINUTE ORDER granting 351 Motion to Vacate. The three-day trial set to commence on January 22, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. and the Final Trial Preparation Conference set on Wednesday, January 16, 2013, at 2:00 p.m., as well as all trial related deadlines, are VACATED. The parties shall file a status report by Friday, January 25, 2013 by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/08/13.(jjhsl, )
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge dated August 21, 2012 332 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Injunctive Relief as Moot 319 is DENIED, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/25/12.(sgrim)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 337 MINUTE ORDER. ORDERED that the [Amended] Motion [#335] is GRANTED. Attorney Huss is relieved of any further representation of Defendants in this case. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to terminate Attorney Huss as counsel of record, and to remove her name from the electronic certificate of mailing. ORDERED that the Initial Motion [#334] is DENIED AS MOOT by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 08/30/12.(jjhsl, )
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 293 is AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED. Plaintiff's Objections to the Recommendation 302 are OVERRULED. ORDERED that Plaintiffs "Request Permission to File Supplemental Plea ding for Retaliation by DOC" 289 is DENIED. ORDERED that Plaintiff's "Request for a Court Order to Prevent Force Feeding of Plaintiff" 290 is DENIED. ORDERED that Plaintiff's "Request for Court Order to Receive ADA Exam" 291 is DENIED. ORDERED that the Order and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 300 is AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED. Plaintiff's Objection to the Recommendation 313 is OVERRULED. Plaintiff's earlier Objection 303 is OV ERRULED AS MOOT. ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 236 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgement [sic] 245 is DENIED. ORDERED that Plaintiffs "Request to Ammend [sic] Complaint" 279 is DENIED by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/08/12.(jjhsl, )
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 308 MINUTE ORDER denying 294 Notice to the Court of Defendants' Refusal to Provide Medical Records by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 05/29/12.(jjhsl, )
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 306 MINUTE ORDER granting 304 Motion requesting clarification of orders received 5-3-12 5-11-12 & 5-14-12 & notice to court of objection to use of old ADA standard. This case is also now included on the list of pro se cases available for volunteer counsel, maintained by the Clerk of Court by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 05/22/12.(jjhsl, )
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 288 MINUTE ORDER granting 286 Correction of heading requesting leave to ammend [sic] complaint to supplemental pleading. A written recommendation on the pending motions in this matter will issue in due course by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 04/17/12.(jjhsl, )
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 285 MINUTE ORDER denying 282 Motion Requesting Use of Type Writer [sic] by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 04/10/12.(jjhsl, )
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 277 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 274 Motion to Amend Complaint. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is instructed to mail a copy of the Minute Order located at Docket No. 243, with a copy of this Minute Order, to Plaintiff at the address listed on the docket by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 02/24/12.(jjhsl, )
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 272 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 270 Plaintiff's Motion to Add Defendant & Mental Disability to Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/17/12.(lyg, )
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 264 MINUTE ORDER. ORDERED that the Notices, filed as motions, 260 and 262 are DENIED. The deadline for Plaintiff's response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment remains set at February 15, 2012. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail an additional copy of the Motion for Summary Judgment located at Docket No. 236, in addition to a copy of this Minute Order, to Plaintiff at the address listed on the docket by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/19/12.(jjh, )
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 241 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. The Clerks Office is directed to mail to Plaintiff another copy of the prisoner complaint form used in this District by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/17/11.(jjh, )
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER denying 228 Motion to Stay. ORDERED that the deadline for the filing of any dispositive motion is extended up to and including November 18, 2011 by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/18/11.(jjh, )
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 227 MINUTE ORDER denying 224 Request for Stay of Proceedings & Conference with Atty [sic] General. ORDERED that the dispositive motions deadline is sua sponte extended up to and including November 1, 2011. All remaining requests for relief are DENIED by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 09/27/11.(jjh, )
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MINUTE ORDER denying 200 Request for Court Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 05/02/11.(jjh, )
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER Staying Case. Ordered that the Motion for Reconsideration 172 is Granted in part. Ordered that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 175 is Denied without prejudice. Dispositive motions, if any, may be refiled on or before 10/01/11. ORDERED that during the pendency of the stay, neither party shall file pleadings with the Court, except under extraordinary circumstances or at the Courts direction. ORDERED that if either party believes that the case would benefit from a status conference after expiration of the stay, they shall file a motion requesting this relief by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 03/30/11.(jjh, )
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Minute ORDER denying 182 Motion Requesting Court Order Instructing Staff at C.C.F. Unit G to Send Out Legal Mail by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 02/24/11.(jjh, )
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER that Plaintiffs Objection to Order of Judge Daniels Dated Nov. 4,2010" 151 , and 154 are OVERRULED as improper. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/20/2011. (erv, )
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER denying 161 Plaintiff's Request for a Stay of Proceedings. Plaintiff is warned that the filing of any future pleadings which are false or misleading may result in sanctions, including the dismissal of his case, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/14/11.(mnf, )
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER denying 164 Plaintiff's Motion for the Court's Intervention by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/6/2011.(erv, )
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER denying 156 Plaintiffs Motion in Support of Motion for an Order Compelling Discovery and Motion for an Order Compelling Discovery by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/14/2010.(erv, )
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 150 Plaintiff's Motion for Order an Order Compelling Discovery. Any future motion which does not comply with this Order shall be summarily denied on the merits, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/18/2010.(wjc, )
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 144 Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Compelling Discovery by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/4/2010.(erv, )
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MINUTE ORDER denying 135 Plaintiff's Motion for Order that the Court order his prison facility to keep a certain tape player on hand until resolution of his case. The Court has no authority to order a nonparty, here Plaintiffs prison facility, to take any action in this lawsuit. Further, to the extent that Plaintiffs claim are successful at trial, he will obtain appropriate legal remedies. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/10/2010.(erv, )
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER denying 136 Non-Party Douglas Burns Motion to Intervene by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/8/2010.(erv, )
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MINUTE ORDER Denying 131 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel ; Denying Without Prejudice 132 Plaintiff's Motion for Order Directing the Attorney General to Produce Documents. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/27/2010.(erv, )
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 AMENDED ORDER re: 120 Order on Plaintiff's 118 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/20/2010. (erv, )
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER AFFIRMED AND ADOOPTED 115 Report and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge. it is ORDERED that Defendants 85 Motion to Dismiss Complaint is DENIED by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/17/2010.(erv, )
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER denying 105 Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Stay of All Court Procedings [sic]; denying 106 Plaintiffs Motion Requesting Intervention by the Court Because of Retaliation by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/21/2010.(klmcd)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER denying 95 Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants [sic] Motion to Dismiss by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/12/2010.(erv, )
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED 84 Report and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge; denying 60 Motion for Order to Stop Retaliatory Move. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/17/2010.(erv, )
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 60 MOTION for Order to filed by Wellman E. Gibson be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/21/2010. (erv, )
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER OVERRULED 59 Plaintiff's Objection to Order Reinstating and Assigning Case and the relief requested in the Objection is denied. filed by Wellman E. Gibson by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/6/2010. (erv, )
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying 65 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying without prejudice 66 Plaintiff's Motion for Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/11/09.(erv, )
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER Denying as moot 50 Plaintiff's Motion for Order; granting in part 51 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave; denying 57 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; denying 58 Plaintiff's Motion for Order; Holding in Abeyance 60 Plaintiff's Motion for Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/3/09.(erv, )
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AMENDED ORDER re: 54 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/30/09. (wydcd, rrk)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Reinstating and Assigning Case. The instant action is reinstated pursuant to the 10/05/2009 Order issued by the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit in this case. This action shall be assigned to Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel, pur suant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, and to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. The Motion Requesting Judge Weinshienk be Precluded From This Case and a New Judge be Appointed 38 is denied as moot. The Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 39 is denied as unnecessary. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 11/19/2009.(sah, )
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Minute ORDER denying 34 Motion Requesting Status of Case and Additional Request for Damages by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 10/23/09.(jjh, )
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 15 Notice of Appeal, by Wellman Gibson, by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 06/23/09. Appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a proper 1915 motion with district court.(bjrsl, )
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying Motion to Reconsider. Order that requests 9 12 10 11 are construed as a Motion to Reconsider and the Motion is denied. Ordered that the 06/10/09, Objection is construed in part as a Notice of Appeal. Ordered that the Clerk of Court shall process that Notice of Appeal by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 06/17/09. (jjh, )
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of Dismissal. Ordered that the complaint and the action are dismissed as legally frivolous by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 05/28/09. (jjh, )
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Payment of an Initial Partial of an Initial Partial Filing Fee. Order Denying 5 Motion to Access Medical and AIC Files by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/12/09.(jjh, )
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to submit a 1915 motion with an original signature, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/27/09. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Campbell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wellman F. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Marie Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Holst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Steinbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steinbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aasen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?