Home Design Services, Inc. v. Ruckman, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Home Design Services, Inc.
Defendant: Ruckman, Inc., Terry M. Ruckman, James Dee Whiteley and Annie M. Whiteley
Case Number: 1:2009cv01027
Filed: May 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice 49 filed 10/27/2009, is APPROVED. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 06/25/2010, is VACATED. The jury trial set to commence 07/12/2010, is VACATED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/27/2009. (sah, )
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 36 Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint andMemorandum of Law in Support Thereof. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or before 10/09/2009. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 09/25/2009.(sah, )
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER. The Stipulation For Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendants James Dee Whiteley and Annie M. Whiteley 38 filed 09/21/2009, is APPROVED. Plaintiffs claims against defendants, James Dee Whiteley and Annie M.Whiteley, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. Defendants, James Dee Whiteley and Annie M. Whiteley, are DROPPED as named parties to this action, and the case caption is amended accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/21/2009. (sah, )
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Jury Trial (4 days) set for 7/12/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 6/25/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/8/09. (rebsec, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Home Design Services, Inc. v. Ruckman, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home Design Services, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony M. Lawhon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruckman, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry M. Ruckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dee Whiteley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annie M. Whiteley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?