Burden v. Isonics Corp.
Plaintiff: Stephen Burden
Defendant: Isonics Corp.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01028
Filed: May 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 626 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay his or its own costs and attorneys fees. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/9/09. (erv, )
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. The 08/17/2009 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe 20 is ACCEPTED and,for the reasons cited therein, Defendants Partial Motion to Dismiss 8 is GRANTED and Plaintiffs claims for retaliation (Claim 2) and violation of OWBPA (Claim 3) are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/15/2009.(sah, )
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 Partial MOTION to Dismiss filed by Isonics Corp., be granted, and plaintiffs Claims Two and Three be dismissed with prejudice. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/17/09. (erv, )
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/30/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/20/09. (erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burden v. Isonics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Burden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isonics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?