Campbell v. Milyard et al
Plaintiff: Earl William Campbell, Jr.
Defendant: Kevin Milyard, Floyd Pohlman, Gagen Singh, Beverly Dowis, Paula Franty, Joann Stock, B. Webster and Sterling Regional Med. Center
Case Number: 1:2009cv01041
Filed: May 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 219 Notice of Appeal by Earl William Campbell Jr., appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a 1915 motion with district court by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/12/11. (bjr, )
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER ADOPTS AND AFFIRMS 200 Report and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge. Granting 145 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment; This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/23/2011.(erv, )
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER denying 193 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/31/2011.(erv, )
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER re: 145 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kathern Rittinhouse, Johnson, Floyd Pohlman, Paula Frantz, Gagen Singh, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall respond to the Motion for Summary Judgment 145 on or before July 18, 2011. No extensions of time shall be permitted. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/17/2011. (erv, )
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 180 Notice of Appeal by Earl William Campbell Jr., appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a 1915 motion with district court by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 05/24/11. (bjrsl, )
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED 170 Report and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge; Granting 140 Defendant Pohlmans Motion for Summary Judgment and all claims asserted by Plaintiff that pertain to Defendant Pohlman are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff has not shown good cause for his failure to timely serve Defendant Webster. His claims, as they pertain to Defendant Webster are, therefore, DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/9/2011.(erv, )
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting 155 Motion for Leave to Respond, Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs pending discovery requests on or before February 17, 2011; denying 152 Plaintiffs Motion to File Out of Time or; Motion for Extension of Time; or Any Heading Deemed Appropriate by the Court by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/19/2011.(erv, )
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER ACCEPTED 137 Report and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge. denying 118 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 118 Motion for TRO; granting 129 Defendant Milyards Motion to Dismiss; Accordingly, the case against Defendant Milyard is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/8/2010.(erv, )
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 118 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Earl William Campbell, Jr., be DENIED; and 129 MOTION to Dismiss The Final Complaint filed by Kevin Milyard, be GRANTED and that the case against him be dismissed with prejudice. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/15/2010. (erv, )
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Granting Service by the United States Marshal re: 123 Amended Complaint filed by Earl William Campbell, Jr. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/7/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Service of Process Form)(erv, )
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Denying 109 Plaintiff's Motion to Renew Plaintiff's Request for Assistance of Counsel. Granting 110 Motion to Renew Request for Service on Defendant Brian Webster, P.A.C. Plaintiff to file amended complaint on Court's prisoner complaint form by 8/26/10. Clerk to mail 2 copies of the form to plaintiff, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/2/10.(gmssl, )
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Adopting and affirming the Report and Recommendation 79 . Denying 32 Defendant Pohlman's Motion to Dismiss. Granting in part and denying in part 37 Defendants Milyard, Pohlman, Singh, Frantz, Fortunato, Dowis, Stock, Rittenhouse, an d Johnsons Joint Motion to Dismiss. Granting 50 SRMC's Motion to Dismiss. Denying 51 Defendant SRMC's Motion to Dismiss. Denying 73 Defendant SRMC's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs Claim 1 against Defendants Milyard, Dowis, Fortunato, and Stock is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs Claim 1 against Defendant SRMC is dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiffs Claim 1 against Defendants Singh and Rittenhouse is dismissed without prejudice in part. Plaintiffs Claim 2 and 3 against Defendant Milyard are dismissed without prejudice. The following claims remain: (a) an Eighth Amendment claim against Dr. Pohlman; (b) an Eighth Amendment claim against Dr. Singh for denying medical care after Plaintiffs first surge ry and for denying Plaintiff pain medication between 2003 and 2007; (c) an Eighth Amendment claim against Rittenhouse for 20 denial of pain medication; (d) an Eighth Amendment claim against Dr. Frantz; and (e) a retaliation claim against Johnson, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/29/10.(gmssl, )
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 AGREED PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/1/2010. (erv, )
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER denying 36 Plaintiffs Motion to Strike by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/4/2010.(klmcd)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER ADOPTING AND AFFIRMING 59 Report and Recommendations by United States Magistrate Judge,and Brian Webster is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as a Defendant in this case. Denying as moot State Defendants 48 Motion to Enforce; by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/8/2010.(erv, ) (Modified on 3/9/2010 corrected typo)(erv, ).
December 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER 48 Granting MOTION to Enforce 30 Order to Show Cause, filed by Beverly Dowis, Johnson, Floyd Pohlman, Paula Franty, Jo Ann Stock, Kevin Milyard, J.G. Tortunato, Gagen Singh. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Or der to Show Cause is made ABSOLUTE. Plaintiff has failed to show cause as to why the Court should not recommend dismissal of Defendant Webster. I respectfully RECOMMEND that Defendant Brian Webster be DISMISSED without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) & 41(b). by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/31/09. (erv, )
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER denying 42 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 45 Plaintiff's Motion for Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/15/09.(erv, )
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DRAWING CASE. Ordered that this case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/04/2009. (sah, )
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/21/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Milyard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl William Campbell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Milyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyd Pohlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gagen Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Dowis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Franty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joann Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Regional Med. Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?