Romero v. Denver Public Schools, District No. 1 et al
Plaintiff: Paul Romero
Defendant: Denver Public Schools, District No. 1, Debra (I) Rodriguez, Debra Rodriguez, Scott (I) Barnes, Scott Barnes, Brittany Dew and Fred Martinez
Case Number: 1:2009cv01043
Filed: May 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Opinion and ORDER granting 45 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Case is dismissed with prejudice. Final trial preparation conference set 7/23/10 and jury trial set 8/2/10 are vacated. Defendants to have their costs by filing a Bill of Costs within 14 days, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/22/10.(gmssl, )
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 4 Defendants Motion to Dismiss Second, Eighth, Ninth, and Tenth Claims for Relief. Plaintiffs Second claim for relief alleging willful and wanton negligence against all Defendants is DISMISSED AS TO Defendants Barnes, Rodriguez, and the District. It survives as to Defendants Dew and Martinez. Plaintiffs Eighth claim for relief alleging libel per se against Defendants Rodriguez and the District is DISMISSED IN ITS ENTIRETY. Plaintiffs Ninth and Tenth claims for relief alleging breach of contract and promissory estoppel against Defendants Rodriguez, Barnes, and the District are DISMISSED AS TO Defendants Barnes and Rodriguez. Both claims survive as to the District. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/18/2010.(erv, )
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/9/2010. (klmcd)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 35 Stpulated Motion for Protective Order, due to a conflict between 1 and 3 of the proposed Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/26/2010.(erv, )
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Defendants Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 09/30/2009.(sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero v. Denver Public Schools, District No. 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Romero
Represented By: Stuart A. Jay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Public Schools, District No. 1
Represented By: Holly Eileen Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra (I) Rodriguez
Represented By: Holly Eileen Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Rodriguez
Represented By: Holly Eileen Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott (I) Barnes
Represented By: Holly Eileen Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Barnes
Represented By: Holly Eileen Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Dew
Represented By: Holly Eileen Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Martinez
Represented By: Holly Eileen Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?