Nasious v. Mueller et al
Plaintiff: John Nasious
Defendant: Nancy Mueller, Barry Goldsmith, Paula Frantz, Stephen Kreibs, Joseph G. Fortunato, Jo Ann Stock, Tejender Singh, John Suthers, Brian A. Webster, Jason Zwirn, Joseph J. Wermers, Shane McMahil, Johnson, Nancy White, St. Martin, Kenneth Le Fever, Mark Bolt, Weingardt, Cathie Holst, Adrienne Jacobson, Nancy (I) Mueller, Barry (I) Goldsmith, Paula (I) Frantz, Stephen (I) Kreibs, Joseph (I) G. Fortunato, Jo Ann (I) Stock, Tejender (I) Singh, John (I) Suthers, Brian (I) A. Webster, Jason (I) Zwirn, Joseph (I) J. Wermers, Shane (I) McMahil, (I) Johnson, Nancy (I) White, (I) St. Martin, Kenneth (I) Le Fever, Mark (I) Bolt, (I) Weingardt, Cathie (I) Holst and Adrienne (I) Jacobson
Case Number: 1:2009cv01051
Filed: May 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 224 filed8/12/2011, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED. Defendants Cathie Holst and Adrienne Jacobsons Motion To Dismiss 217 filed 7/29/2011, is GRANTED. Plaintiffs remaining claim under Title II of the Americans With Disabilities Act for prospective injunctive relief based on his photophobia is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Judgment SHALL ENTER on behalf of defendants, Cathie Holst and Adrienne Jacobs on, against plaintiff, John Nasious, on plaintiffs claim under Title II of the Americans With Disabilities Act for prospective injunctive relief based on his photophobia; provided, that the judgment as to this claim against these defendants shallbe w ithout prejudice. Judgment further SHALL ENTER on behalf of defendants, State of Colorado Office of the Governor Bill Ritter; Nurse Martha Mueller, Physician Health Partners; Dr. Barry Goldsmith, Physician Health Partners; Paula Frantz M.D. CMO, Col orado Dept. Of Corrections; Stephen Kreibs M.D. Physician, Health Partners Agent of Record; P.A. Brian Webster, Physician Health Partners (Ft Myers, Fl); PA Tejeender Singh, Physician Health Partners; Aristedes Zavaras, Executive Director CDOC; Jose ph Gary Fortunado D.O. Physician Health Partners; P.A. Joann Stock, Physician Health Partners; Nurse Nancy White, Physician Health Partners; Joseph Wermers, M.D., Physician Health Partners; CO St. Martin, Colorado Dept. of Corrections; CO Regina John son, Medical Department Colorado Dept. of Corrections; Captain Weingardt, Colorado Dept. of Corrections; Lt Mark Bold, Colorado Dept. of Corrections; Lt Jason Zwirn, Colorado Dept. of Corrections; Cathie Holst, Manager of Correctional Legal Services, ADA Coordinator, AIC CDOC; Adrienne Jacobson, LegalAssistant AIC/ADA Coordinator CDOC; Sgt. Becky Ball, Colorado Dept. of Corrections; Lt. Jimerson, Colorado Dept. of Corrections; Ms. Haverly Libraian [sic], Colorado Dept. of Corrections; and John D oe and Jane Doe, all in their individual and official capacities, against plaintiff, John Nasious, in accordance with my Order Concerning Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 201 filed June 29, 2011; provided, that the judgment as to the claims against these defendants shall be with prejudice. Defendants are AWARDED their costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/16/2011.(sah, )
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs John Nasious Request to the Court to Apply Liberal Reading to All Plaintiffs Motions and Litigation Attempts 219 is DENIED as moot. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/3/2011.(sah, )
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER. A settlement conference is scheduled for 8/29/2011 in Courtroom C-201, Second Floor of the Byron Rogers U.S. Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The conference will begin at 9:00 a.m. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/12/2011. (sah, )
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 207 Notice of Appeal by John Nasious, appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a 1915 motion with district court by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/11/11. (bjrsl, )
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER. Defendants CO Kenneth Lefever, Major Johnson, Lt. ShaneMcMahills Motion for Clarification of Order Concerning Recommendation ofUnited States Magistrate Judge [Doc. No. 201] 203 filed 6/30/2011, isGRANTED. Defendants, CO Kenneth Lefever, Major Johnson, and Lt. ShaneMcMahill, all in their individual and official capacities, are DROPPED as named parties from this action, and the case caption is AMENDED accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/6/2011.(sah, )
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER. The Recommendation on United States Magistrate Judge 194 filed 4/22/2011, is APPROVED and ADOPTED as an order of this court to the extent the magistrate judge recommends that the defendants motions for summary judgment 149 , 150 , 151 , 152 155 be granted. Please see order for details. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/29/2011.(sah, )
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER. The Court accepts and adopts the Recommendation in its entirety. Defendants Warden Broaddus And Major Two Bears Chavez Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Claim For Deprivation Of Fourth Amendment Right To BeFree From Unreasonable Search And Seizure 115 is granted. Defendants Warden Broaddus and Major Two Bears Chavez are dismissed from this action with prejudice, and the case caption shall be amended accordingly. Defendants Warden Broaddus And Major Two Bears Chavez Motion For Summary Judgment. 156 is denied as moot. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 2/22/2011.(sah, )
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MINUTE ORDER DENYING 122 Plaintiffs letter/motion for the court to order the CDOC to allow Nasious access to the law library and have Canfield schedural [sic] Nasions, 6 hrs a week min". by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/20/2010.(erv, )
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER. Defendant State of Colorado - Office of the Governor Bill Ritters Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint 58 is granted as to all other claims against Defendant State of Colorado - Office of the Governor Bill Ritter in either an indi vidual or official capacity. Thus, the only claim which remains in this case against Defendant State of Colorado - Office of the Governor Bill Ritter is an official capacity claim for violation of the ADA. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 09/01/2010.(sah, )
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MINUTE ORDER striking 98 Plaintiff's Objections to and Plaintiff's Rebutal [sic] to the State of Colorado Office of Governor Bill Ritter Motion to Dismiss Reply. The document is construed as a sur-response to Defendant State of Colorado-Office of Governor Bill Ritter's 58 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of 90 Courtroom Minutes to Plaintiff, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/12/2010.(wjc, )
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER. Plaintiffs Order to Show Cause For A Preliminary Injunction And A Temporary Restraining Order 65 is denied. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 04/14/2010.(sah, )
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying 76 MOTION to Notify Court of Defendants Making A Mockery of Court Order by Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/2/2010.(kmtcd, )
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER: Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 3/2/2010 09:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/8/10. (ebs, )
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER granting 42 Plaintiffs letter/motion demanding that the Court serve the opposing parties in this case. Plaintiff is no longer required to provide paper copies of documents, excluding written discovery requests and responses, to the defendants in this matter only. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 01/12/2010.(sah, )
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Assign Case to A District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. Defendants Carol Soares and John Suthers are dismissed as parties to this action because Mr. Nasious fails to demonstrate that they personally participated in the asserted constitutional violations. This case shall be assigned to Senior Judge Zita L. Weinshienk pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1C.1., and to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 11/05/2009. (sah, )
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/18/09. (jjh, )
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Minute ORDER granting 7 Motion to Inquire About Response of Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have up to and including 08/07/09 to cure the deficiencies by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 07/14/09.(jjh, )
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file a prisoner complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/4/09. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nasious v. Mueller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Nasious
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Goldsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Kreibs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph G. Fortunato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo Ann Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tejender Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Suthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian A. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Zwirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph J. Wermers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane McMahil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Le Fever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Bolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weingardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathie Holst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrienne Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy (I) Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry (I) Goldsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula (I) Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen (I) Kreibs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph (I) G. Fortunato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo Ann (I) Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tejender (I) Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John (I) Suthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian (I) A. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason (I) Zwirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph (I) J. Wermers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane (I) McMahil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy (I) White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) St. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth (I) Le Fever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark (I) Bolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Weingardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathie (I) Holst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrienne (I) Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?