Deneuve Design, Inc. v. Clarendon America Insurance Co. et al
Plaintiff: Deneuve Design, Inc.
Defendant: Clarendon America Insurance Co. and Deep Sotuh Insurance Services
Case Number: 1:2009cv01057
Filed: May 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulated Motion For Dismissal With Prejudice 37 is GRANTED. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 08/20/2010, is VACATED. The jury trial set for 09/13/2010, is VACATED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/21/2010. (sah, )
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER. 12-day Jury Trial set for 9/13/2010 at 8:30 AM and Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/20/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/1/09. (rebcd)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING: Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/24/09. (kmtcd)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 08/18/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deneuve Design, Inc. v. Clarendon America Insurance Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deneuve Design, Inc.
Represented By: William J. Kowalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarendon America Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deep Sotuh Insurance Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?