Pittsburgh Standard Spine Co. v. Lanx, LLC
Plaintiff: Pittsburgh Standard Spine Co.
Defendant: Lanx, LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv01062
Filed: May 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER. The Stipulated Motion For Entry of Settlement Agreement as anOrder of The Court and Administrative Closure of Case 121 filed 07/22/2010, is GRANTED. The Settlement Agreement 123 filed 07/22/2010, is APPROVED and entered as an order of the court. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, the clerk is DIRECTED to close this civil action administratively, subject to re-opening for good cause. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 07/23/2010, and thetrial to the court set to commence 07/26/2010, are VACATED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/29/2010.(sah, )
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER. Defendant Lanxs Motion To Dismiss Pittsburghs Third and fifth Claims for Relief 40 filed 12/21/2009, is DENIED. The defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 57 filed 03/15/2010, is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/28/2010.(sah, )
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 87 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order 45 . Discovery due by 6/11/2010, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/3/2010.(mjwcd)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE ORDER granting 64 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order 45 .Fact and expert Discovery due by 5/31/2010. Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 57 shall be due on 4/15/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set 5/6/2010 08:30 AM is vacated.Final Pretrial Conference reset for 6/15/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/2/2010.(mjwcd)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 53 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 45 is modified to require the completion of fact and expert discovery no later than 30 days after 4/12/2010, and to require the disclosure of rebuttal expert witnesses by 3/15/2010, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/5/2010.(mjwcd)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER granting 42 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order 16 , by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/11/2010.(mjwcd )
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER granting 32 plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint. The tendered Amended Complaint 33 is accepted for filing as of the date of this Minute Order. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/07/2009.(sah, )
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 28 the parties' Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. The Settlement Conference set for 11/23/2009 is VACATED AND RESET for 1/11/2010 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. The parties shall submit their confidential settlement statements on or before 01/06/2010. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/19/2009.(sah, )
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 25 parties' Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Section 8.a. of the Modified Scheduling Order entered in this action on 10/08/2009 be and hereby is amended to change the date stated therein to 11/18/2009. The Modified Scheduling Order shall in all other aspects remain in full force and effect. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/16/2009.(sah, )
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/8/09.(gmssl, )
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/11/09. (erv, )
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER a five (5) day Bench Trial set for 7/26/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 7/23/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/30/09. (rebsec, )
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. A Scheduling/Planning Conference is set for 7/30/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 05/20/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pittsburgh Standard Spine Co. v. Lanx, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pittsburgh Standard Spine Co.
Represented By: David Richard Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lanx, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?