Creel v. Jahani et al
Plaintiff: Tonya Creel
Defendant: Sam Jahani and Urgent Care, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Sam Jahani and Urgent Care, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Tonya Creel
Case Number: 1:2009cv01063
Filed: May 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Montrose
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 AMENDED ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND DISMISSING CASE. The Order Discharging Order To Show Cause and Dismissing Case [# 78 ] is VACATED and SUPPLANTED by the present order. The Order To Show Cause [# 76 ] is DISCHARGED. Plaintiff's claims against defendants, Sam Jahani, D.O., and Urgent Care, Inc., a Colorado corporation, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 05/08/2012. (wjcsl, )
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND DISMISSING CASE. The Order To Show Cause 76 filed April 59, 2012, is DISCHARGED. Plaintiff's claims against defendants, Sam Jahani, D.O., and Urgent Care, Inc., a Colorado corporation, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/30/12. (mjgsl, )
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER. All proceedings against Defendants are STAYED unless and until relief from the automatic stays in Bankruptcy Case Nos. 10-22380 HRT and 10-22379 MER is granted. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a status report in this case within ten days of any relief from stays in the bankruptcy cases. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/21/2010. (sah, )
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER RESETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference reset for 4/20/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/16/2010. (kmtcd, )
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SECOND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 11/8/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 10/22/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/11/10. (rebsec, )
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER RESETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 4/19/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/18/09. (kmtcd, )
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying 29 MOTION to Stay or in the Alternative for Entry of a Protective Order Under F.R.C.P. 26(c) by Defendant Sam Jahani by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/25/09. (kmtcd)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER granting in part 29 Defendants Motion to Stay or In the Alternative for Entry of a Protective Order Under F.R.C.P. [sic] 26(C) [sic]. Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants Motion no later than 11/09/2009. Defendants shall file a reply no later than 11/12/2009. Discovery shall be stayed pending resolution of the remaining issues presented in Defendants Motion. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/02/2009.(sah, )
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/15/09. (kmtcd)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/10/09. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 7/12/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 6/24/2010 at 01:15 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebsec, )
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING: Scheduling Conference set for 9/10/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/19/09. (kmtcd)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of Recusal. Case is returned to clerk for reassignment by random draw, by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 6/15/09. (gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creel v. Jahani et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Creel
Represented By: Michael S. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Jahani
Represented By: Michael Craig Santo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urgent Care, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Craig Santo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Sam Jahani
Represented By: Michael Craig Santo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Urgent Care, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Craig Santo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Tonya Creel
Represented By: Michael S. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?