Sanchez v. Gebhardt Automotive, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jose A. Sanchez
Defendant: Gebhardt Automotive, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01117
Filed: May 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER for Dismissal. Ordered that this action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 02/03/10. (jjh, )
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Vacating Settlement Conference. Order granting 20 Motion to Vacate. The Settlement Conference set for 12/16/09 is vacated. The parties are relieved from their obligation to file a Confidential Settlement Statement by 12/10/09 by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/09/09.(jjh, )
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Defendant's Second Motion to Reschedule Settlement Conference and granting 17 Defendant's First Amended Motion to Reschedule Settlement Conference; Settlement Conference reset for 12/16/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 09/14/2009.(mjwcd )
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 7/30/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 05/20/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Gebhardt Automotive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Sanchez
Represented By: Terrance L. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gebhardt Automotive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?