Edwards v. Rocky Mountain Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tana Edwards
Defendant: Rocky Mountain Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2009cv01121
Filed: May 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1101 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Granting 35 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), this matter, and all claims asserted therein, is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/3/10. (ebs, )
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER granting 28 Defendant's Motion to Cancel November 18, 2009, Settlement Conference. The Settlement Conference set for November 18, 2009, is hereby vacated. The parties are instructed to conference together and call Chambers at (303) 844-4507 on or before November 20, 2009, to reschedule. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/16/2009. (mehcd)
August 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Setting Hearing Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16: Hearing set for 10/30/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/9/09.(ebs, )
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 8/10/2009 is VACATED and RESET to 9/17/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/22/2009. (mehcd)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate and Reset the Preliminary Rule 16 Conference Currently Scheduled for 7/9/09. Parties need not submit the joint statement required by the Court's Order setting the hearing 3 . Court may reset this hearing for a later date. This Order does not affect the scheduling conference currently set for 8/10/09, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/29/09.(ebs, )
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SETTING HEARING UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 16: In Court Hearing set for 7/9/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. At least ten days prior to the hearing, the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint statement addressing the issues set forth in this Order, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/27/09. (ebs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Rocky Mountain Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tana Edwards
Represented By: Thomas A. Bulger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Mountain Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?