Bachmeier v. Tire Distribution Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Emily Bachmeier
Defendant: Tire Distribution Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01126
Filed: May 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Rio Grande
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 9/2/2010 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Motion to Preclude or Limit Opinion Testimony of Plaintiffs Listed Witnesses, Robert Caldwell, Clarence Christiansen, Bastiaan Cornelissen, Joe Culek, Rod Dyer, and Mike Schadegg And To Preclude Mention of Same in Opening Statement, filed August 27, 2010 79 , is resolved as stated on record. Defendant's Motion to Limit Testimony of Plaintiff's Witness, Mike Barnett, To Disclosures, filed September 2, 2010 83 , is resolved as stated on record.(Reporter FTR - K. Terasaki) (rpmcd)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 8/25/2010 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Forthwith Leave to Take Late Discovery Deposition, filed August 20, 2010 72 , is granted and deposition will be conducted by remote services. Counsel shall submit a joint list of witnesses and an agreed joint statement of case by September 1, 2010. (Reporter FTR - K. Terasaki) (rpmcd)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Pretrial Conference held on 8/17/2010 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Opposed Motion in Limine Concerning Seatbelt Evidence, filed May 19,2010 49 : Nebraska Law is applicable and the effect depends upon the evidence. Plaintiff's Felonious Killing Claim is excluded re: 63 . Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Post-Accident Wheel Stud Installation Procedures, filed June 25, 2010 57 , is denied but manufactures post accident written communications is excluded. Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Unduly Speculative Evidence of Mr. Bachmeier's Future Earnings, filed August 10, 2010 69 , is granted to the extent stated on record. Proposed voir dire and jury instruction are to be submitted in paper directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. September 1, 2010. Final Pretrial Order signed. (Reporter FTR - K. Terasaki) (rpmcd)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Minute ORDER Granting 64 65 Motions to Reset. The conference is rescheduled for August 17, 2010, at 2:00 p.m. in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The proposed pretrial order shall be delivered in paperform directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on Thursday, August 12, 2010, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/30/2010.(rpmcd )
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting 60 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Concerning Reference to Worker's Compensation Benefits, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/8/2010. (rpmcd)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re: 49 MOTION in Limine. Counsel should be prepared to discuss this matter at the pretrial conference, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/25/2010. (rpmcd )
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER for Dismissal of Defendant Jim Hager re: 47 . Ordered that the complaint against Defendant Jim Hager is dismissed without prejudice by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 05/03/10.(jjh, )
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 9/7/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/6/2010. (rpmcd)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting 32 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Modify the 22 Scheduling Order for the Purpose of Allowing the Corporate Deposition of Tire Distribution Systems, Inc., deadline extended to February 19, 2010, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/28/2010.(rpmcd)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER to Comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 re: 25 Protective Order, as to any information to be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/14/2009. (rpmcd)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Amend Complaint. Ordered that the Second Amended Complaint which accompanied the Plaintiff's Motion is hereby accepted for filing by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 06/16/09.(jjh, )
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/31/2009 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on July 23, 2009. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/5/2009. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bachmeier v. Tire Distribution Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Bachmeier
Represented By: Randal R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tire Distribution Systems, Inc.
Represented By: David Christopher Fawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?