AMI Mechanical, Inc. v. St. Andrews/Alliance et al
Plaintiff: AMI Mechanical, Inc.
Defendant: St. Andrews/Alliance and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 1:2009cv01131
Filed: May 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 270 Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: This case has been resolved. Dismissal Paper due by 12/8/2009, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/17/09. (bnbcd, )
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/25/09. (msksec, )
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 15 Stipulated Motion for Stay of Case. Supplemental Scheduling Conference set for 8/25/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/7/09.(gms, )
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/7/2009 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/05/09. (wjc, )
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/29/09. (mskcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMI Mechanical, Inc. v. St. Andrews/Alliance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMI Mechanical, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Clay Ruebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Andrews/Alliance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?