Falco et al v. YRC Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Falco and Jason Vestal
Defendant: YRC Inc. and Teamsters Local Union 961
Case Number: 1:2009cv01144
Filed: May 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 the Renewed Motion to Dismiss from Defendant YRC Inc. Pursuant to F.R.P.C Rule 12(b)(6); granting in part and denying in part 29 Defendant Teamsters Local Union 961's Renewed Motion to Dismiss. The motions are GRANTED to the extent that Count III of Plaintiffs Amended Complaint is hereby DISMISSED. Defendants motions are DENIED in all other respects as set forth supra. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/3/2010.(erv, )
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 44 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and modifying 42 Scheduling Order filed on 8/18/09. Discovery deadline is extended to 3/1/2010 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed no later than 3/30/2010, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/18/09.(cbssec)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER Denying as moot Without Prejudice 7 Defendant YRC Inc. Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.P.C. [sic] Rule 12(b)(6); Denying as moot Without Prejudice 8 Defendant Teamsters Local Union 961's Motion to Dismiss; Defendant Teamsters Local Union 961's Renewed Motion to Dismiss, and Reply to Plaintiffs Combined Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss 27 , filed July 10, 2009, is STRICKEN with leave to refile as a renewed motion to dismiss. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/13/09.(erv, )
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 15 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and is accepted for filing nunc pro tunc June 22, 2009. by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/7/09.(erv, )
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 8/18/2009 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/23/09. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falco et al v. YRC Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Falco
Represented By: Jesse Howard Witt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Vestal
Represented By: Jesse Howard Witt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local Union 961
Represented By: Michael J. Belo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?