Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. v. Doe
Plaintiff: Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2009cv01185
Filed: May 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER FOR EXONERATION OF BOND AND DISPOSITION OF SEIZED MATERIALS. The Bond posted by Plaintiffs counsel in the amount of One Hundred Dollars ($100) shall be and hereby is exonerated, and shall be released to counsel for the Plaintiff. The cle rk shall either send the released Bond to Plaintiffs counsel in the form of a check to the address listed below in California, or by chargeback to the credit card used for payment. Plaintiff is authorized to destroy or otherwise dispose of all infringing merchandise, by Judge John L. Kane on 09/23/09. (wjc, )
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: Defendants, their agents, servants, etc., are enjoined and restrained from: Using any or all of the trademarks, servicemarks, logos, etc. The U.S. Marshal for this district or for any district in which Plaintiff seeks to enfo rce this Order in the United States, the state police, etc., are authorized to seize and impound any and all unauthorized merchandise. Any Defendant who is served with a copy of this Order who objects to the provisions may submit objections to this Court within ten (10) days of the date of seizure. The bond is continued until final disposition of this matter. See Order for further details, by Judge John L. Kane on 06/05/09. (wjc, )
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER OF SEIZURE; AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/5/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 802 before Judge John L. Kane. This Order conditioned upon filing an undertaking in the f orm of a surety bond, credit card payment, check, or cash in the amount of $100 no later than 05/29/09. Order to show cause with the complaint be made upon the Defendants by the Plaintiff. Defendants' responsive papers, if any, shall be f iled on or before 06/02/09. Any reply shall be filed on or before 06/04/09. Plaintiff is to provide copies of all other filed pleadings at the request of any identified defendant, by Judge John L. Kane on 05/26/09. (wjc, ) Modified on 5/26/2009 to add show cause text (wjc, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.
Represented By: Cara R. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?