Bain v. Harrison School District No. 2 et al
Plaintiff: Latasha Bain
Defendant: Harrison School District No. 2, Annette Ontiveros, F. Mike Miles, David McKenzie, Dee Mullins, Maryanne Wiggs and Aljean Tucker
Case Number: 1:2009cv01188
Filed: May 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. The Plaintiff filed a Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice 61 . This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay his, her or its own attorneys' fees and costs. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 08/10/2010. (sah, )
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER granting 57 Defendants Unopposed Motion for Leave to Allow Insurance Counsel to Appear by Telephone. Counsel must be available throughout the entirety of the Settlement Conference to receive a telephone call from Defense counsel. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/5/2010.(klmcd)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER granting 49 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to AmendScheduling Order; granting 51 Defendants UnopposedMotion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Discovery. Discovery due by 6/14/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 7/16/2010. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/24/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/19/2010.(klmcd)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/26/2010. (klmcd)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference is vacated and reset for 9/17/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/31/2009. ORDERED that Karen Glickstein, counsel for Defendants, shallappear telephonically at the Scheduling Conference.(klmcd)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference; Scheduling Conference set for 8/10/2009 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/7/2009. (klmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bain v. Harrison School District No. 2 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasha Bain
Represented By: Cathy L. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison School District No. 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette Ontiveros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Mike Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dee Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryanne Wiggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aljean Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?