Papadimitrio v. Norgren, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robyn Papadimitrio
Defendant: Norgren, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01223
Filed: May 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER OF DISMISSAL approving the 28 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 5/28/2010 is vacated. The Jury Trial set for 6/21/2010 is vacated. This action is dismissed with prejudice with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/8/10. (ebs, )
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 09/09/2009. (sah, )
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/25/09. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 6/21/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 5/28/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebsec, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Papadimitrio v. Norgren, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Papadimitrio
Represented By: Charles W. Hemphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norgren, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?