Parker v. Board of Education of Academy School District No. 20, The
Plaintiff: Carolynn Parker
Defendant: Board of Education of Academy School District No. 20, The
Case Number: 1:2009cv01245
Filed: May 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice 24 is APPROVED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorneys fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/30/2009. (sah, )
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER denying 16 as moot Plaintiff's Motion to Take Emergency Deposition; granting in part and denying in part 19 the Joint Motion to Extend Scheduling Deadlines in Order to Finalize SEttlement of Case. The Scheduling Conference set f or 11/4/2009 at 9:45 AM is CONVERTED to a Telephonice Status Conference in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. The parties shall conference together and call Chambers at (303) 844-4507 at the designated time. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/26/2009. (mehcd)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Plaintiff's Second Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference set for 10/6/2009 at 09:30 AM is CONVERTED to a Status Conference in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/22/2009. (mehcd)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Plaintiff's "Unopposed" Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2009 is VACATED and RESET to 10/6/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/6/2009. (mehcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Board of Education of Academy School District No. 20, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolynn Parker
Represented By: Cathy L. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of Academy School District No. 20, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?