Michaels v. AKAL Security, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sue Anne Michaels
Defendant: AKAL Security, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01300
Filed: June 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Zita L. Weinshienk
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Plaintiffs Motion To Dismiss With Prejudice 72 is granted. This action is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2), the parties to pay their own costs and attorneys fees. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 09/16/2010. (sah, )
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER re: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Clarification of Order, docket #58 62 . The Court agrees with Plaintiff that there is a typographical error in section IV. Analysis: V. Akal Claims. The Courts Order dated 06/24/2010 58 is amended as described. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 08/11/2010.(sah, )
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SECOND ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 8/10/2010 at 8:00 a.m., in Courtroom A 402, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/30/10. (cbssec)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER. Defendant Attorney Generals Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint 51 is granted in part and denied in part. Claims Eight, Eleven, Twelve, and Thirteen are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). The case shall proceed on Claims One through Seven, Nine, and Ten. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 06/24/2010.(sah, )
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER. Defendant Attorney Generals Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint 34 is denied as moot as Plaintiff filed a Second Amended Complaint 49 filed 11/10/2009. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 03/19/2010.(sah, )
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 11/10/2009. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Pursuant toFed.R.Civ.P.15, doc # 42 is GR ANTED. Plaintiff's Second AmendedComplaint #[42-2] is deemed filed as of today's date. ORDERED: Defendant Attorney General's Motion to Stay Proceedings, doc # 35 isGRANTED. Discovery is STAYED pending a ruling on the Motion toDismiss , doc # 34 . The exceptions to the Stay of Discovery will be theparties' continuing efforts under Rule 7.1A to meet and confer to resolvediscovery disputes relating to discovery that was served before the Motion toStay was filed and discovery th at was served or responded to in advance ofthis ruling. The Defendant has agreed to make Mr. Zahren available fordeposition to be conducted on a mutually agreeable schedule after a rulingon the pending Motion to Dismiss. ORDERED: Defendant Holder shall file supplemental discovery responses under Rule 26(b) within 30 days of today's date by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/10/09. (cbssec)
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying as moot 5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Alternative Motion for Joinder, by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 7/1/09.(gmssl, )
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 8/21/2009 at 9:15 a.m. in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/23/09. (cbssec)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL directing assignment to another judge by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/05/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michaels v. AKAL Security, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Anne Michaels
Represented By: Gregory Alan Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKAL Security, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Fontelle Keimig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?