Montezuma Valley Irrigation Company v. Dolores Water Conservancy District et al
Plaintiff: Montezuma Valley Irrigation Company
Defendant: Dolores Water Conservancy District and USA
Case Number: 1:2009cv01307
Filed: June 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Montezuma
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Presiding Judge: David L. West
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 138 Uncontested Motion for Dismissal. This case in its entirety is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, the parties to bear their own costs and attorney fees, by Judge John L. Kane on 01/31/2011.(wjc, )
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER denying 100 Defendants' Motion to Vacate and Reschedule the 05/24/2010 Settlement Conference, by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 05/20/2010.(wjc, )
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Re: Leave to Amend Complaint and Rescheduling Settlement Conference and Alternative Dispute Resolution Process/Mediation Plan. Court GRANTS Plaintiff Montezuma Valley Irrigation Company's 76 Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint for t he reasons stated therein. The amended Complaint shall be deemed filed as of the date of this Order. The Court has also reviewed Defendant Dolores Water Conservancy District's 86 Motion to Clarify. For the reasons set forth in Defendants' ; motion it is hereby ORDERED that the Court's 83 Order of 03/01/2010 is hereby VACATED. The Parties are ORDERED to forthwith contact the Clerk of this Court and reschedule a settlement conference to be scheduled with this Court to take place in May 2010, in Grand Junction, Colorado. Status Report due by 5/14/2010, by Magistrate Judge Laird T. Milburn on 03/31/2010.(wjc, )
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Re: 53 Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify. The Court finds that it is in the best interests of justice, that it should recuse itself from this case and recommends another Magistrate be drawn from the Western Slope so as to accommodate the parties, by Magistrate Judge David L. West on 01/29/2010.(wjc, )
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER OF SANCTIONS. The monetary sanction of $100.00 against the Plaintiff, Montezuma Valley Irrigation Company, shall be paid by 03/01/2010 to the Defendant, Dolores Water Conservancy District, to defray, in part, the cost of their expert, Steve Harris, who did appear at the 10/22/2009 Settlement Conference, by Magistrate Judge David L. West on 01/27/2010. (wjc, )
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 66 Motion for Leave to Submit the Draft Scheduling Order After Due Date, by Magistrate Judge David L. West on 01/19/2010.(wjc, )
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 6 Ute Mountain Ute Tribe's Motion to Intervene pursuant to F.R.C.P. 24(b), by Magistrate Judge David L. West on 08/26/09.(wjc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montezuma Valley Irrigation Company v. Dolores Water Conservancy District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montezuma Valley Irrigation Company
Represented By: Kelly R. McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolores Water Conservancy District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?