Cox v. De'Longhi S.p.a. et al
Plaintiff: Helen Cox
Defendant: De'Longhi S.p.a., De'Longhi America, Inc. and De'Longhi Group, The
Case Number: 1:2009cv01324
Filed: June 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulated Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice 64 is APPROVED. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 06/25/2010, is VACATED. The jury trial set for 07/12/2010, is VACATED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE without costs awarded to any party. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/22/2010. (sah, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTE ORDER granting 58 the Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The parties shall designate all experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before 02/15/2010. The parties shall de signate all rebuttal experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before 03/08/2010. Discovery due by 4/15/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2010. B y Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/02/2010.(sah, )
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER: denying without prejudice 53 Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/25/10.(bnbcd, )
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER : A second revised scheduling order, modified as discussed shall be prepared by the parties and submitted to the court on or before October 30, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/26/09. (bnbcd, )
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER. The Stipulation of Dismissal DeLonghi Group Only 39 , filed10/21/2009, is APPROVED. Plaintiffs claims against defendant DeLonghi Group only are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, each party to pay its own attorney fees and costs. Defendant DeLonghi Group is DROPPED as a named party to thisaction. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/22/2009. (sah, )
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for 6/25/2010 at 3:30 PM and a five-day Jury Trial is set for 7/12/2010 commencing at 8:30 AM, in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/6/09. (rebcd)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. A scheduling conference is set for 10/06/2009, at 8:30 a.m.,in Courtroom 401, 4th floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall prepare a proposed scheduling order and submit it to the court on or before 10/01/2009. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/19/2009. (sah, )
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/24/09. (bnbsec, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. De'Longhi S.p.a. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Cox
Represented By: Angela Elizabeth McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De'Longhi S.p.a.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De'Longhi America, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan Lee Lipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De'Longhi Group, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?