Peters-Tatro v. Mink et al
Plaintiff: Amber Peters-Tatro
Defendant: Ted Mink, Karen Duffy Vaughey Sturgeon and Patricia Witte
Case Number: 1:2009cv01359
Filed: June 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER for Dismissal. Ordered that this action is dismissed with prejudice against defendant Correctional Healthcare Mangement, Inc. each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fee. The action is now closed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 04/15/10. (jjh, )
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER for Dismissal. Ordered that this action is dismissed with prejudice against defendants Sheriff Ted Mink, Patricia McIntosh (f/k/a Patricia Witte) and Karen Duffy Vaughey Sturgeon, each party to bear their own costs and attorneys fees by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 04/14/10. (jjh, )
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 20 Plaintiff's Revised Motion to Amend Complaint andAdd an Additional Party and the First Amended Civil Rights Complaint attached thereto is accepted for filing, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/12/2009.(rpmcd)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Scheduling Conference held on 10/23/2009 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Amended Complaint due by November 9, 2009. If Mr. Gillam represents the Correctional Healthcare Management then counsel will confer and submit a revised proposed scheduling order. Karen "Duffy" Sturgeon and Patricia Mcintoshs Motion to DismissPlaintiffs Fourth (Negligence in the Operation of a Jail) And Sixth(Negligence per Se) Claims for Relief Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6),filed July 28, 2009 9 , is resolved by the filing of an amended complaint. (Reporter FTR - K. Terasaki) (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peters-Tatro v. Mink et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Peters-Tatro
Represented By: Michelle L. Searcy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Mink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Duffy Vaughey Sturgeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?