Wigton v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey D. Wigton
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company and Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2009cv01369
Filed: June 12, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 32 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice, each party to bear their own atty fees and costs by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/13/09.(erv, )
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 18 Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint, The Motion to Amend is filed to cure the deficiencies identified in the Motion to Dismiss. Denying as moot 14 Motion to Dismiss Party ; Denying as moot 14 Motion to Dismiss; by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/17/09.(erv, )
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/3/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/23/09. (erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wigton v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey D. Wigton
Represented By: Richard Michael Kaudy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?