Bryant v. City and County of Denver et al
Plaintiff: Renee Bryant
Defendant: City and County of Denver and Richard Dean De Olivas Sens Y Cordova Rael
Case Number: 1:2009cv01398
Filed: June 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER ACCEPTED 47 Report and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge, and, for the reasons cited therein, the Court DISMISSES this case with prejudice for plaintiffs failure to prosecute this action, and Defendants Motion for Summary judgment 40 , filed September 30, 2010, is denied as moot. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/27/2010.(erv, )
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the District Court dismiss this case with prejudice for Plaintiffs failure to prosecute this action, and deny Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, filed September 30, 2010 40 as moot. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/7/2010. (erv, )
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Drawing in Part and to Dismiss in Part to A District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. Defendant Richard Dean De Olivas Sena Y Cordova Rael is dismissed from this action. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 09/02/2009. (sah, )
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 07/17/09. (jjh, )
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file a complaint on the proper court form, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/16/09. (jak, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. City and County of Denver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Dean De Olivas Sens Y Cordova Rael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?