Dobbs v. Morbank, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alexander A. Dobbs
Defendant: Morbank, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01403
Filed: June 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MINUTE ENTRY for Jury Trial Day One held before Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/5/2012: 101 ; 102 ; 103 ; 104 ; 105 ; 106 ; 107 and 108 Motions in Limine are all DENIED with leave to renew. Jury selection; initial instructions to jury. Trial continued. (Court Reporter: Paul Zuckerman) (mskcd)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 11/1/2011, granting in part and denying in part 77 Plaintiff's Combined Motion to Compel Supplementation of Discovery Responses, Motion for Sanctions, and Motion to Allow Supplemental Discovery and a Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition for Trial Preservation Purposes. (FTR: C. Coomes -- Courtroom A-501) (mehcd)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER SETTING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL PREPARATION REQUIREMENTS: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/1/11. (msksec, )
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER AND NOTICE OF EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Evidentiary Hearing set for 12/16/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/30/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/15/10. (msksec, )
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER striking 50 Morbark Inc.'s Motion to Strike, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/23/2010. (mehcd)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/17/2009. (mehcd)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER granting 20 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Filing an Amended Complaint. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to enter the Amended Complaint and Jury Demand located at docket 20 -2, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 09/10/09.(wjc, )
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/31/09. (msksec, )
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/6/09. (mskcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dobbs v. Morbank, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander A. Dobbs
Represented By: Gerald P. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morbank, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?