Fox v. Fremont School District RE-1 et al
Plaintiff: Michael J. Fox
Defendant: Fremont School District RE-1 and Robin Gooldy
Case Number: 1:2009cv01407
Filed: June 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation of Dismissal 21 filed 11/11/2009, is APPROVED. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 06/25/2010, is VACATED. The jury trial set to commence 07/12/2010, is VACATED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/12/2009. (sah, )
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER granting 18 the Stipulated Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference. The Settlement Conference set for 11/2/2009 is VACATED. Dismissal Papers due by 11/30/2009. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/27/2009. (mehcd)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/17/09. Five (5)day Jury Trial set for 7/12/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 6/25/2010 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebsec, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox v. Fremont School District RE-1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Fox
Represented By: Charles F. Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fremont School District RE-1
Represented By: Karen R. Glickstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Gooldy
Represented By: Karen R. Glickstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?