February 29, 2012 |
Filing
156
MINUTE ORDER. Matthew D. Spohns Motion To Withdraw 155 is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/29/2012.(sah, )
|
February 28, 2012 |
Filing
153
ORDER. On the terms stated in this order, the relief requested in the letter 146 filed by defendants, Chares S. Bradford and Michael J. Leary, on 4/14/2011, is GRANTED otherwise, the relief requested in the letter 146 filed by defendants, Chares S. Bradford and Michael J. Leary, on April 14, 2011, is DENIED. On the terms stated in this order, the relief requested in the letter 152 filed by defendants, Charles S. Bradford and Michael J. Leary, on 5/2/2011 is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/28/2012.(sah, )
|
April 6, 2011 |
Filing
145
AMENDED ORDER IMPOSING SANCTIONS FOR CONTEMPT OF COURT in re: 143 Order filed on 3/25/2011. I enter this Amended Order Imposing Sanctions for Contempt of Court solely to (1) withdraw my finding that defendants Bruce Hoover and Linda Mitchell are in contempt of this court; and (2) to vacate all sanctions imposed against defendants Bruce Hoover and Linda Mitchell in the Order Granting Motion To Remand 122 and the Order Imposing Sanctions for Contempt of Court 143 filed 3/25/2011. The courts Order Imposing Sanctions for Contempt of Court 143 filed 3/25/2011, is WITHDRAWN and REPLACED and SUPERSEDED by this Amended Order Imposing Sanctions for Contempt of Court. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/6/2011.(sah, )
|
March 25, 2011 |
Filing
143
ORDER. The plaintiffs Motion Regarding Defendants Contempt of Order ToPay Sanctions 135 filed 3/16/2010, is GRANTED. The Plaintiffs Motion Regarding Lisa Welch Stevens Contempt of Order to Pay Sanctions and File Responsive Pleading 139 filed 11/4/2010, is GRANTED. Please see Order for details. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/25/2011.(sah, )
|
September 14, 2010 |
Filing
138
ORDER. the Plaintiffs Motion To Amend or Correct Order RemandingAction, or Alternatively To Adjudicate Pending Motions for Sanctions 123 filed 01/04/2010, is GRANTED to the extent the plaintiffs seek adjudication of their motion for sanctions [108 ] under § 1927, otherwise is DENIED. the Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions under 28 U.S.C. § 1927 Against Lisa Welch Stevens 108 filed 12/07/2009, is GRANTED in part, otherwise DENIED. Under 28 U.S.C. § 1927, the plaintiffs are AWARD ED reasonable attorney fees in the amount of four thousand five hundred thirty-eight dollars. Lisa Welch Stevens shall pay this amount to counsel for the plaintiffs on or before 10/29/2010. On or before 10/08/2010, defense counsel, Lisa Welch Stevens, SHALL FILE a response to the plaintiffs Motion Regarding Defendants Contempt of Order To Pay Sanctions 135 filed 03/16/2010. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/14/2010.(sah, )
|
December 30, 2009 |
Filing
122
ORDER. The Plaintiffs Motion To Remand for Lack of Federal Jurisdiction andfor Award of Fees and Costs 5 , is GRANTED. This case is REMANDED to the District Court of El Paso County, Colorado (where it was filed originally as Case No. 09CV1653). Un der 28 U.S.C. § 1447(c), the plaintiffs are awarded $4,000 dollars in attorney fees and costs. The defendants SHALL PAY $4,000 dollars in attorney fees and costs to the plaintiffs by 02/15/2010. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/30/2009.(sah, )
|
December 29, 2009 |
Filing
121
MINUTE ORDER granting 114 The Unopposed Motion of Defendants Hoover and Mitchell for Order... to Permit Waiver of Appearance at Settlement Conference. Defendants Hoover and Mitchell are excused from appearing at the Settlement Conference scheduled in this case on 01/06/2010. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/29/2009.(sah, )
|
December 3, 2009 |
Filing
104
ORDER granting in part 83 the Motion to File an Amended Answer Adding Counterclaims against Plaintiffs filed by Defendants StatGuard, Stanley, Leary and Bradford, as to the first, second, third, fifth, sixth, seventh, eight, and ninth counterclaims. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/03/2009.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (sah, )
|
November 27, 2009 |
Filing
93
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 73 Plaintiffs Motion to Shorten Safe Harbor Period under Fed. R. Civ. P. 11(c)(2). By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/27/2009.(sah, )
|
November 9, 2009 |
Filing
82
MINUTE ORDER granting 80 the Stipulated Motion to Amend Caption. The Clerk of the Court is directed to amend the caption to reflect the name change from "StatGuard, LLC" to "StatGuard Technologies, Inc., a Delaware corporation." By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/9/2009. (mehcd)
|
November 6, 2009 |
Filing
71
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendants and for Award of Fees and Costs; granting in part and denying in part 57 Defendants' Amended Motion for Protective Order. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/6/2009. (mehcd)
|
November 2, 2009 |
Filing
70
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 66 Certain Defendants' Motion to File an Amended Answer Adding Counterclaims Against Plaintiffs for an apparent inconsistency. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/2/2009. (mehcd)
|
October 27, 2009 |
Filing
63
Courtroom Minutes/Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 10/27/2009, denying 39 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify, taking under advisement 43 Motion to Compel, and taking under advisement 57 Motion for Protective Order. (Court Reporter FTR - C. Coomes) (mehcd)
|
October 8, 2009 |
Filing
53
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 49 Motion for Protective Order and Response to Motion to Compel. Defendants may re-file their response and motion in separate documents on or before 10/13/2009. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/8/2009. (mehcd)
|
August 28, 2009 |
Filing
36
MINUE ORDER denying 30 Defendants' Motion to Amend Answer to Add Counterclaims Against Plaintiffs, and denying 34 Defendants' Motion to Amend Answer to Add Cross-Claims Against Third Parties. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/28/2009. (mehcd)
|
August 20, 2009 |
Filing
26
TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/20/09. Ten (10) day Jury Trial set for 6/21/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 6/4/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebsec, )
|
August 10, 2009 |
Filing
23
MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Plaintiff's Request [Motion] for Award of Fees. Defendants' counsel is sanctioned in the amount of $496.00 to be paid to counsel for Plaintiff as a reasonable sanction of attorney's fees. This amount shall be paid no later than August 31, 2009. Counsel for Defendants shall file a Notice of Compliance with Order re: Sanctions on or before September 4, 2009. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/10/2009. (mehcd)
|