Rose v. City and County of Denver et al
Plaintiff: Wayne C. Rose
Defendant: City and County of Denver and Gerald R. Whitman
Case Number: 1:2009cv01498
Filed: June 25, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Crowley
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER for Dismissal With Prejudice. All parties to pay their own costs and fees by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/15/10. (jjh, )
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice. ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Defendants Thomas J. Sherwood and Mark S. Woodward 34 is GRANTED. Each party to bear his own attorneys' fees and costs and the caption is amended accordingly by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/03/10.(jjh, )
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 7/28/2010 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Defendant Thomas J. Sherwood's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, filed June 11, 2010 25 , is denied. (Reporter FTR - K. Terasaki) (rpmcd)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER for Dismissal of Defendant Mark S. Woodward with Prejudice. Each party to pay their own costs and attorneys fees by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 07/19/10. (jjh, )
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/21/2010 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on April 15, 2010, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/23/2010. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose v. City and County of Denver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne C. Rose
Represented By: Marc A. Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald R. Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?