Smith v. Government Employees Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jamie L. Smith
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2009cv01520
Filed: June 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice and hereby Orders that Defendant Government Employees Insurance Company, and any and all claims and cross-claims that have been or could be asserted against it regarding this lawsuit, are dismissed from this lawsuit with prejudice.By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 07/12/2010. (sah, )
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. The Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant, GEICO 15 , and the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff, Jamie L. Smith 18 are DENIED. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 05/19/2010.(sah, )
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JOINT STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 12/21/09. (cbssec)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 9/17/2009 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/5/09. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Government Employees Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie L. Smith
Represented By: Robert A. Garcin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Meloney Cargil Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?