Freedman v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Plaintiff: Keith S. Freedman
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01523
Filed: June 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to the 43 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), this matter, and all claims asserted therein, is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/26/10. (ebs, )
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Defendant Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Vacate the Settlement Conference. The Settlement Conference set for 12/11/2009 at 9:00 a.m. is vacated. Dismissal Paper due by 1/19/2010, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/3/09.(ebs, )
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER accepting 11 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Denying as moot 5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/28/09.(ebs, )
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss be denied as moot. Ordered: Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's second Motion to Dismiss 8 on or before 7/31/09, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/9/09. (ebs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freedman v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith S. Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: P. Christian Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?