Allen v. Gurevich et al
Plaintiff: Thomas M. Allen
Defendant: Sergey Gurevich, Robert Kleman, Chad Walker, Arapahoe County Sheriff's Office, The, City and County of Denver and Arapahoe County
Case Number: 1:2009cv01533
Filed: June 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 65 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Amend 19 Scheduling Order. The Dispositive Motion deadline of 4/5/2010 is hereby amended and extended to and until the date fourteen (14) days after the date upon which the Court enters its ruling with respect to the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation Regarding Defendants 64 Motion for Sanctions by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/5/2010.(erv, )
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 56 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Dismiss his $319,000 Foreclosure Damage Claim. The foreclosure damage claim in the amount of $319,000 is DISMISSED. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/8/2010.(erv, )
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/19/2009. (mjwcd)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 14 Defendant Arapahoe County's Motion to Dismiss, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/9/09.(gms, )
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave of Court to Amend Complaint. Tendered Amended Complaint 21 is accepted for filing as of this date, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/6/09.(gmssl, )
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Robert Kleman. Defendant Kleman is dismissed, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/2/09.(gmssl, )
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate ; granting 9 Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference Set for August 25, 2009. Scheduling Conference Reset for 9/22/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/19/09.(erv, )
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/25/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 07/14/2009. (mjwcd )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Gurevich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas M. Allen
Represented By: Douglas Leo Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergey Gurevich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Kleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arapahoe County Sheriff's Office, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arapahoe County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?