Pownell v. Credo Petroleum Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Timothy J. Pownell
Defendant: Credo Petroleum Corporation and James T. Huffman
Case Number: 1:2009cv01540
Filed: June 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Trial Preparation Conference held on 8/3/2011 before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. ORDERED: Counsel shall meet and confer as set forth on the record. By 8/12/2011, counsel shall file another set of jury instructio ns, amended exhibit lists and any unopposed or joint motion to dismiss. Ruling deferred on 217 Defendants' Motion in Limine Concerning Testimony from Plaintiff's Expert Witness, William Kaempfer. If counsel cannot agree on admissibility o f exhibits produced after the discovery cutoff, a motion in limine shall be filed by 8/12/2011, and a response shall be filed within five days thereafter, not to exceed 8/17/2011. By 8/12/2011, counsel may supplement matters that relate to expert te stimony which do not involve new discovery. By 8/12/2011, a motion in limine pertaining to settlement communications may be filed, and a response shall be filed within five days thereafter, not to exceed 8/12/2011. A statement of the case instructio n shall be filed by 8/12/2011. If the parties cannot agree, two versions shall be filed. By 8/12/2011, Plaintiff may file an initial brief on the wage act claim issue, and a response shall be filed within five days thereafter, not to exceed 8/12/2011. (Court Reporter: Therese Lindblom) (lbush)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER. Ordered that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 150 is Affirmed and Adopted. Ordered that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint 105 is Denied. Ordered that Plaintiffs Expedited Unopposed Motion to Stay Brie fing and Ruling on Plaintiffs Objection to the Recommendation to Deny Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint While Plaintiffs Motion to Reconsider the Recommendation is Pending 180 is Denied as Moot. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Amended Objection to Recommendation to Deny Motion to Amend Complaint and Objection to Order Denying Motion to Reconsider Recommendation to Deny Motion to Amend Complaint 207 , is OVERRULED by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 06/29/11.(jjh, )
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER. Ordered that the Motion to Reconsider the Recommendation re: 194 is Denied. Ordered tht the Court's Recommendation 150 stands by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 05/03/11. (jjh, )
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MINUTE ORDER granting 176 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Response Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Support Brief. Plaintiffs Supplemental Response Brief, attached as Exhibit A to the Motion shall be accepted as filed on this date by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 04/18/11.(jjh, )
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER: Plaintiff's Oral Motion for Sanctions is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's motion is denied to the extent that it seeks sanctions against Defendants for failing to initially produce an appropriately redacted copy of th e board meeting minutes. Plaintiff's motion is denied to the extent that it seeks sanctions against Defendants for failing to produce an appropriately redacted copy of the email exchange, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/17/11. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(eseam)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 123 Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions for Failure to Comply With the Courts Discovery Orders. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the attorneys shall call the Court on a joint conference call to obtain a hearing regarding the dispute. The Courts telephone number is 303.335.2770. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/28/2011.(erv, )
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER re: 98 Plaintiffs Notice of Requested Documentation in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before December 10, 2010, Defendant shall produce copies of minutes of Board m eetings which occurred between January 1 and June 2, 2008 and February 14 and June 30, 2009 which refer to discussions about Plaintiff. All other information in such minutes shall be redacted. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/3/2010. (erv, )
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Minute Entry/Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix: Granting 91 Defendants Expedited Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Pretrial Conference and for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion ; Telephonic Motion Hea ring held on 11/12/2010 ; Dispositive Motions due by 1/21/2011., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/14/2010., Discovery Hearing set for 11/17/2010 11:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix., Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/22/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix.). (erv, ) (Modified on 11/15/2010 corrected the time for the Discovery Hearing to 11:30)(erv, ).
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying 79 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/5/2010.(erv, )
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER granting 83 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and Extend Deadline to Complete Discovery to Permit One Deposition. Discovery due by 10/22/2010 solely for the purpose of allowing Plaintiff to take the deposition of Marie Heuser. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/30/2010.(erv, )
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Minute ORDER granting 75 Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/26/2010, Dispositive Motions due by 9/9/2010, and Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/1/2010, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/2/10.(lyg, )
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Minute ORDER denying 69 Motion for Protective Order Filed by W. Mark Meyer and John A. Rigas without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/14/10.(lyg, )
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER granting 65 Stipulated Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order: Discovery due by 7/30/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 8/16/2010. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/12/2010. Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 9/8/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/15/2010.(erv, )
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER granting 62 Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and Extend Deadline to Complete Discovery as to Depositions and Subpoenas Duces Tecum Only, and to Extend Deadline to File Dispositive Motions. Discovery due by 6/15/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2010. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/12/2010.(klmcd)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying with leave to refile, 46 Plaintiff Timothy J. Pownells Motion for Summary Judgment Against CREDO Petroleum Corporation on His Fifth, Sixth and Seventh Claims for Relief; granting 54 Defendant CREDO Petroleum Corporations F.R.C.P. 56(f) Motion for Order in Opposition to Timothy J. Pownells Motion for Summary Judgment Against CREDO Petroleum Corporation on His Fifth, Sixth and Seventh Claims for Relief by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/7/2010.(erv, )
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER granting 43 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Insurance Company Representative to Participate by Telephone at 11/24/09 Settlement Conference, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/23/09.(gmssl, )
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/8/2009. (mjwcd)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay his or its own costs and fees in this matter. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/22/09. (erv, )
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 07/24/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pownell v. Credo Petroleum Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy J. Pownell
Represented By: Christopher Anthony Taravella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credo Petroleum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James T. Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?